Global Patent Index - EP 1257622 A1

EP 1257622 A1 2002-11-20 - LUBRICANT CONTAINING CARBON DIOXIDE FOR FORMING METALS

Title (en)

LUBRICANT CONTAINING CARBON DIOXIDE FOR FORMING METALS

Title (de)

SCHMIERMITTEL ENTHALTEND KOHLENSÄUREESTER ZUR UMFORMUNG VON METALLEN

Title (fr)

LUBRIFIANT CONTENANT DES ESTERS DE DIOXYDE DE CARBONE DESTINE AU FORMAGE DE METAUX

Publication

EP 1257622 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01915217 A

Priority

  • DE 10007625 A
  • EP 0101443 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0160958A1] The invention relates to the use of carbon dioxide esters of general formula (I) in lubricants for forming metals under the effects of sliding friction. In said formula: R and R' can be identical or different and each represent a linear or branched alkyl group, a cycloalkyl group or an alkyl-cycloalkyl group, each with between 5 and 30 C atoms. The invention also relates to lubricants containing carbon dioxide esters of general formula (I) and one or more components selected from a) mono and/or diesters of mono or oligophosphoric acids with between 1 and 6 P atoms having linear or branched fatty alcohols with between 12 and 22 C atoms, or their non-esterified starting products b) triglycerides of fatty acids with between 12 and 22 C atoms and c) methyl esters of fatty acids with between 12 and 22 C atoms. The lubricants are preferably devoid of mineral oil.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 169/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 105/48 (2006.01); C10M 129/48 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/04 (2013.01); C10M 105/48 (2013.01); C10M 129/48 (2013.01); C10M 2203/045 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2815 (2013.01); C10M 2207/325 (2013.01); C10M 2207/401 (2013.01); C10M 2215/04 (2013.01); C10M 2215/08 (2013.01); C10M 2223/0405 (2013.01); C10N 2230/40 (2013.01); C10N 2230/43 (2013.01); C10N 2240/402 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0160958A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0160958 A1 20010823; CZ 20022810 A3 20021113; DE 10007625 A1 20010823; EP 1257622 A1 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090114

2008-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080903

2008-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR IT LI

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR