Global Patent Index - EP 1257624 A1

EP 1257624 A1 2002-11-20 - WATER-SOLUBLE COPPER, COPPER ALLOYS AND NON-FERROUS METALS INTERMEDIATE COLD AND HOT ROLLING COMPOSITION

Title (en)

WATER-SOLUBLE COPPER, COPPER ALLOYS AND NON-FERROUS METALS INTERMEDIATE COLD AND HOT ROLLING COMPOSITION

Title (de)

WASSERLÖSLICHE KALT-UND WARMWALZZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR KUPFER, KUPFERLEGIERUNGEN UND NICHT-EISENMETALLEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DE LAMINAGE A CHAUD ET A TEMPERATURE INTERMEDIAIRE DE METAUX NON FERREUX, D'ALLIAGES DE CUIVRE, ET DE CUIVRE HYDROSOLUBLE

Publication

EP 1257624 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01905750 A

Priority

  • EP 01905750 A
  • EP 0101381 W
  • EP 00400348 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1123971A1] The present invention relates to a water-soluble copper, copper alloys and non-ferrous metals intermediate cold and hot rolling composition comprising a base stock oil and, based on the total weight of the composition : from 1 to 80% by weight of a combination of a monoester of a fatty acid with a polyol and a tetraester of a fatty acid with pentaerythritol; the weight monoester : tetraester ratio of said combination ranging from 1:20 to 10:1; and from 0.02 to 2% by weight of an azole derivative. The invention also relates to an oil-in-water emulsion, an intermediate cold rolling process, a hot rolling process and the use of the oil-in-water emulsion in an intermediate cold or hot rolling process. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 173/00; C10M 169/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 45/02 (2006.01); C10M 101/02 (2006.01); C10M 125/14 (2006.01); C10M 129/10 (2006.01); C10M 129/16 (2006.01); C10M 129/42 (2006.01); C10M 129/74 (2006.01); C10M 129/76 (2006.01); C10M 133/08 (2006.01); C10M 133/38 (2006.01); C10M 133/44 (2006.01); C10M 133/46 (2006.01); C10M 135/10 (2006.01); C10M 135/32 (2006.01); C10M 135/36 (2006.01); C10M 137/04 (2006.01); C10M 155/02 (2006.01); C10M 159/04 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10M 173/00 (2006.01); C10N 20/02 (2006.01); C10N 30/00 (2006.01); C10N 40/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 173/00 (2013.01); C10M 141/06 (2013.01); C10M 141/12 (2013.01); C10M 2201/105 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1065 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/126 (2013.01); C10M 2207/283 (2013.01); C10M 2207/289 (2013.01); C10M 2209/104 (2013.01); C10M 2215/042 (2013.01); C10M 2215/223 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2229/02 (2013.01); C10N 2230/02 (2013.01); C10N 2230/12 (2013.01); C10N 2230/24 (2013.01); C10N 2240/402 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 2209/104 + C10M 2209/108

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0159046A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1123971 A1 20010816; AT 278753 T 20041015; AU 2001233748 B2 20041223; AU 3374801 A 20010820; BR 0108159 A 20030121; CA 2397879 A1 20010816; CN 1395612 A 20030205; DE 60106208 D1 20041111; DE 60106208 T2 20060216; EP 1257624 A1 20021120; EP 1257624 B1 20041006; JP 2003522282 A 20030722; US 2006142167 A1 20060629; WO 0159046 A1 20010816

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080207

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080207

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070201

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050306

2007-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-01-08 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070108

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-01-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070105

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-09-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20041006

2005-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050207

2005-02-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050207

2005-02-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050207

2005-01-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-01-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050106

2005-01-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050106

2005-01-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050106

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60106208 P 20041111

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-10-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PRINCE, FRANCIS

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CLAIRE, JEAN-YVES

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020827

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI