Global Patent Index - EP 1257628 A1

EP 1257628 A1 2002-11-20 - AGGLOMERATES CONTAINING LAYERED MINERALS AND NONIONIC SURFACTANTS

Title (en)

AGGLOMERATES CONTAINING LAYERED MINERALS AND NONIONIC SURFACTANTS

Title (de)

SCHICHTMINERALHALTIGE AGGLOMERATE MIT NICHTIONISCHEN TENSIDEN

Title (fr)

AGGLOMERES CONTENANT DU MINERAL EN FEUILLETS ET DES TENSIOACTIFS NON IONIQUES

Publication

EP 1257628 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01919340 A

Priority

  • DE 10008815 A
  • EP 0102116 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0162883A1] The invention relates to agglomerates containing layered silicate, with non-ionic tensides, for use as a detergent additive. The agglomerates contain at least one natural or synthetic layered silicate chosen from the group of clays containing montmorillonite, especially betonite, and attapulgite, hectorite and/or beidellite, the quantity thereof being more than 10 wt. % in relation to the total quantity of support materials; at least one precipitated silicic acid, the quantity thereof being at least 12 wt. %, and at least one non-ionic tenside, the quantity thereof being more than 50 wt. %. No compaction or extrusion takes place during the production of the agglomerates.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/12; C11D 1/66; C11D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/74 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/124 (2013.01); C11D 1/66 (2013.01); C11D 1/74 (2013.01); C11D 3/126 (2013.01); C11D 17/0034 (2013.01); C11D 17/0086 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0162883A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0162883 A1 20010830; AT 287942 T 20050215; AU 4647301 A 20010903; DE 10008815 A1 20010830; EP 1257628 A1 20021120; EP 1257628 B1 20050126; ES 2232608 T3 20050601

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161207

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-12-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50105195

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: SEEFELDSTRASSE 69, 8008 ZUERICH (CH)

2012-12-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SUED-CHEMIE IP GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SUED-CHEMIE AG, 80333 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50105195

- Effective date: 20121025

2012-12-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50105195

- Representative's name: STOLMAR & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20121025

2012-12-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50105195

- Effective date: 20121025

2012-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: STOLMAR AND PARTNER, CH

2012-10-15 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: SUD-CHEMIE IP GMBH & CO.KG

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-07-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SUED-CHEMIE IP GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: SUED-CHEMIE AG#LENBACHPLATZ 6#80333 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SUED-CHEMIE IP GMBH & CO. KG#LENBACHPLATZ 6#80333 MUENCHEN (DE)

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100223

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100223

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100223

2010-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SUD-CHEMIE A.G.

- Effective date: 20100228

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090217

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050626

2006-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-06-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2232608 T3

2005-05-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-04-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050426

2005-04-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050426

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50105195 P 20050303

2005-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-02-23 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050223

2005-02-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050223

2005-02-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050214

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2005-01-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20050131

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-01-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2004-09-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: AGGLOMERATES CONTAINING LAYERED MINERALS AND NONIONIC SURFACTANTS

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040324

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SOHLING, ULRICH

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHALL, NORBERT

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HEININGER, WOLFGANG

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI