Global Patent Index - EP 1257675 A1

EP 1257675 A1 2002-11-20 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR PRODUCING HOLLOW MOULDED BODIES FROM METAL

Title (en)

METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR PRODUCING HOLLOW MOULDED BODIES FROM METAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOHLEN GUSSKÖRPERN AUS METALL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR LA PRODUCTION DE CORPS COULES CREUX EN METAL

Publication

EP 1257675 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00942005 A

Priority

  • AT 2302000 A
  • EP 0004964 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0161060A1] The invention relates to a method for producing hollow moulded bodies (48) from metal - especially from steels and Ni and Co base alloys according to an electroslag melting or casting method - using a short, electroconductive, water-cooled chill mould (10) that, together with a mandrel (14) which is arranged within the opening (11) of the chill mould and is also water-cooled, forms a casting or annual gap (18) for the hollow moulded body (48). The metal level is covered by means of an electroconductive slag bath (44) which is heated by supplying direct current or alternating current to the slag bath (18) by means of not directly water-cooled, electroconductive elements (24, 26) which are inserted into the wall of the chill mould (10) and/or the water-cooled mandrel (14) and by subsequently removing said current by means of such elements of the respective other component and/or the formed moulded body (48). At least one of said electroconductive elements (24, 26) is electrically insulated from the remaining components of the water-cooled chill mould (10) or the mandrel (14). The hollow moulded body (48) that is produced in the annular gap (18) and between the chill mould (10) and the mandrel (14) is drawn off towards the bottom or the chill mould (10), together with the mandrel (14), is lifted at the climbing speed of the metal level, whereby the moulded body (48) is stationary.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22B 9/18; B22D 11/00; B22D 23/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/041 (2006.01); B22D 23/10 (2006.01); C22B 9/18 (2006.01); C22B 9/193 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22B 9/18 (2013.01); B22D 11/006 (2013.01); B22D 23/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0161060A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0161060 A1 20010823; AT 409729 B 20021025; AT A2302000 A 20020315; DE 10023097 A1 20010823; DE 50010194 D1 20050602; EP 1257675 A1 20021120; EP 1257675 B1 20050427; JP 2003522648 A 20030729; JP 4563639 B2 20101013

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110601

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-03-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50010194

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-02-07 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *INTECO INTERNATIONALE TECHNISCHE BERATUNG G.M.B.H

- Effective date: 20110531

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100520

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100526

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100420

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100519

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100617

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060130

2006-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050617

2005-06-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-06-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010194 P 20050602

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT SE

2005-04-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT SE

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE