Global Patent Index - EP 1257685 A1

EP 1257685 A1 2002-11-20 - COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR SEALING ANODIZED ALUMINUM

Title (en)

COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR SEALING ANODIZED ALUMINUM

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERSIEGELN VON ANODISIERTETEM ALUMINIUM

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE D'ETANCHEIFICATION D'ALUMINIUM ANODISE

Publication

EP 1257685 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00979151 A

Priority

  • US 0030840 W
  • US 16435199 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0134872A1] U.S. Patent 5,411,607 teaches that mid-temperature-range (76-93 DEG C) sealing of anodized aluminum can be accomplished effectively without any heavy metals, using a sealing composition that contains lithium cations (preferably from lithium acetate) and particular types of anionic surfactants made by sulfonating alkyl substituted diphenyl oxides or similar structures. It has now been found that the resistance of surfaces sealed in this way to yellowing after exposure to ultraviolet light and the tolerances of the sealing process itself for the presence of silicaceous impurities and sulfate ions in the sealing compositions can be considerably improved by using two kinds of these surfactants, one with alkyl substituents that contain 14 or fewer, preferably 12, carbon atomes each and one with alkyl substituents that contain 15 or more, preferably 16, carbon atoms each.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 22/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 11/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 11/246 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0134872 A1 20010517; AU 1656101 A 20010606; CA 2390994 A1 20010517; EP 1257685 A1 20021120; EP 1257685 A4 20060906

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071206

2007-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070726

2006-09-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060803

2004-09-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL CORPORATION

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020610

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI