Global Patent Index - EP 1257702 A1

EP 1257702 A1 2002-11-20 - METHOD AND KNITTING MACHINE FOR RECTILINEAR KNITTING TO FORM A TUBULAR SEAMLESS KNITTED MATERIAL

Title (en)

METHOD AND KNITTING MACHINE FOR RECTILINEAR KNITTING TO FORM A TUBULAR SEAMLESS KNITTED MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND FLACHSTRICKMASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER NAHTLOSEN SCHLAUCHARTIGEN STRICKWARE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET METIER A TRICOTER RECTILIGNE POUR FORMER UN TRICOT TUBULAIRE SANS COUTURE

Publication

EP 1257702 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01906039 A

Priority

  • EP 01906039 A
  • EP 00810150 A
  • IB 0100232 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1127970A1] The invention concerns a knitting machine comprising two needle beds (1, 2, 43, 44) for guiding knitting needles (3), means for selecting said knitting needles (3), carriages (4, 40) for moving the selected knitting needles and members guiding (10) the knitting thread (52). The method consists in arranging the needle beds (1, 2, 43, 44) so that the needles (3) of a needle bed (1; 43) in their normal knitting travel do not cross the needles of the other needle bed (2; 44), in moving the carriages in one direction along each needle bed (1, 2, 43, 44), the displacement directions of said carriages (4, 40) along their respective needle beds being opposite relative to each other and in transferring the thread (52) from the needles (3) of one needle bed (1, 43) to those of the other needle beds (2, 44), each time said thread (52) reaches the end of the selected needles (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 7/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/00 (2006.01); A41D 1/06 (2006.01); D04B 1/00 (2006.01); D04B 1/24 (2006.01); D04B 1/26 (2006.01); D04B 7/32 (2006.01); D04B 15/36 (2006.01); D04B 15/54 (2006.01); D04B 15/96 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 7/32 (2013.01); D04B 15/42 (2013.01); D04B 15/56 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0163031A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1127970 A1 20010829; AU 3400101 A 20010903; CN 1292115 C 20061227; CN 1441867 A 20030910; DE 60133536 D1 20080521; DE 60133536 T2 20090625; EP 1257702 A1 20021120; EP 1257702 B1 20080409; HK 1058059 A1 20070420; JP 2004504499 A 20040212; JP 4188600 B2 20081126; TW 499521 B 20020821; US 2002194883 A1 20021226; US 6626012 B2 20030930; WO 0163031 A1 20010830

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150221

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60133536

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150212

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140217

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-03-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090112

2008-06-25 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2008-05-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60133536 P 20080521

2008-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050607

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020812

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI