Global Patent Index - EP 1257712 A1

EP 1257712 A1 2002-11-20 - A ROAD MARKING COMPRISING MUTUALLY SPACED RIBS

Title (en)

A ROAD MARKING COMPRISING MUTUALLY SPACED RIBS

Title (de)

STRASSENMARKIERUNG MIT VONEINANDER BEABSTANDETEN RIPPEN

Title (fr)

MARQUE ROUTIERE CONSTITUEE DE STRIES ESPACEES

Publication

EP 1257712 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99943569 A

Priority

  • SE 9901364 W
  • SE 9802740 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0009819A1] The present invention relates to a road marking in the form of mutually spaced ribs (1) arranged substantially across the direction of the road. The road marking is characterized in that the ribs (1) form an angle alpha in relation to the road of 25-65 DEG .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/04 (2006.01); E01C 11/24 (2006.01); E01F 9/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/529 (2016.02)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0009819A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FI FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0009819 A1 20000224; AU 5663899 A 20000306; DE 69913391 D1 20040115; DE 69913391 T2 20041125; DK 1257712 T3 20040405; EP 1257712 A1 20021120; EP 1257712 B1 20031203; NO 20010736 A 20010213; NO 20010736 D0 20010213; NO 315981 B1 20031124; RU 2226585 C2 20040410; SE 517955 C2 20020806; SE 9802740 D0 19980817; SE 9802740 L 20000218

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130811

2014-03-31 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20130831

2012-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120802

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110825

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090916

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69913391

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-10-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69913391 P 20040115

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010131

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR