Global Patent Index - EP 1257720 A1

EP 1257720 A1 2002-11-20 - POWER STRIKER MECHANISM WITH BACKDRIVE PREVENTION

Title (en)

POWER STRIKER MECHANISM WITH BACKDRIVE PREVENTION

Title (de)

HILFSKRAFTBETÄTIGTER SCHLIESSBÜGEL MIT RÜCKSPEISUNGSSICHERUNG

Title (fr)

MECANISME DE GACHE ELECTRIQUE AVEC SYSTEME DE RETENUE

Publication

EP 1257720 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01907266 A

Priority

  • CA 0100182 W
  • US 18404200 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0163075A1] A power striker mechanism (10) has a housing (22). A striker (18) is mounted on a striker plate (20) that is mounted on the housing for sliding movement between an inboard and an outboard position. A driver plate (44) is mounted to the housing for sliding movement in a direction orthogonal to the movement of the striker plate (20). An actuator (16) effects movement of the driver plate (44) to thereby effect movement of the striker plate (20) between the inboard and outboard positions. The striker plate (20) has a pin (36) and the driver plate has an S-shaped slot (42). The pin slidably engages the S-shaped slot. The S-shaped slot has end regions extending generally parallel to each other and in the orthogonal direction and is interconnected by a diagonally extending section. When the pin (36) is in the end regions of the S-shaped slot, forces imparted on the striker plate (20) are transmitted to the housing (22) and thereby preventing backlash of the actuator (16). When the pin (36) is in the diagonally extending section, movement of the drive plate (44) effects movement of the striker plate (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 15/02; E05B 47/00; E05B 65/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0163075A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0163075 A1 20010830; AU 3526801 A 20010903; CA 2395248 A1 20010830; CA 2395248 C 20081230; DE 60112549 D1 20050915; DE 60112549 T2 20060330; EP 1257720 A1 20021120; EP 1257720 B1 20050810

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160215

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160215

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150211

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050810

2006-10-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-08-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060811

2006-07-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060511

2005-11-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051121

2005-11-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-09-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60112549 P 20050915

2005-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-08-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-08-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050810

2005-03-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040415

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020812

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI