Global Patent Index - EP 1257730 A1

EP 1257730 A1 2002-11-20 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING WELL FLUID SAMPLE PRESSURE

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING WELL FLUID SAMPLE PRESSURE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KONTROLLIEREN DES DRUCKS EINER FORMATIONSFLÜSSIGKEIT IM BOHRLOCH

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE CONTROLER LA PRESSION D'UN ECHANTILLON DE FLUIDE DE PUITS

Publication

EP 1257730 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00959416 A

Priority

  • US 0023382 W
  • US 0004992 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0163093A1] An apparatus and method for maintaining the pressure of a well fluid sample as the sample is transported to the well surface from a downhole wellbore location. The invention collects a formation fluid sample under pressure. The fluid sample is further pressurized with a traveling piston powered by the hydrostatic wellbore pressure. The pressurized formation fluid sample is contained under high pressure within a fixed volume chamber for retrieval to the well surface. Multiple collection tanks can be lowered into the wellbore during the same run to sample different zones with minimal rig time. The tanks can be emptied at the well surface with an evacuation pressure so that the fluid sample pressure is maintained above a selected pressure at all times.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 49/08; E21B 49/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 49/08 (2006.01); E21B 49/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 49/10 (2013.01); E21B 49/081 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0163093A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0163093 A1 20010830; CA 2401375 A1 20010830; CA 2401375 C 20070123; DE 60041005 D1 20090115; EP 1257730 A1 20021120; EP 1257730 B1 20081203; RU 2002125501 A 20040310; RU 2244123 C2 20050110

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-03-19 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140301

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120809

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110825

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120430

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60041005

- Effective date: 20110301

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100825

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090904

2009-03-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED

- Effective date: 20081224

2009-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60041005 P 20090115

2008-12-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED

2008-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2008-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-12-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051116

2006-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED

2006-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BACKER HUGUES INCORPORATED

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE