Global Patent Index - EP 1257732 A1

EP 1257732 A1 2002-11-20 - MOVING TURBINE BLADE

Title (en)

MOVING TURBINE BLADE

Title (de)

TURBINENLAUFSCHAUFEL

Title (fr)

AUBE DE TURBINE

Publication

EP 1257732 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01913779 A

Priority

  • EP 01913779 A
  • EP 0101063 W
  • EP 00104002 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1128023A1] The invention relates to a moving turbine blade comprising a blade profile (1) with inner cooling which extends out from a blade platform (2) adjoined by a blade foot (4), said blade foot engaging with a turbine disk (3) and having a radial cross-section with an area (5) whose width (6') increases towards the blade platform (2). The aim of the invention is to configure a moving turbine blade of this type in such a way as to enable the moving blade profile to be lengthened. To this end, the blade foot (4) has a hollowed-out section (7) which opens out in the direction facing away from the platform, which comes to a dead end on the platform side and which has a widened cross section in the area (5) of the blade foot (4) whose width (6') increases.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/18; F01D 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/14 (2006.01); F01D 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/081 (2013.01); F01D 5/147 (2013.01); F01D 5/187 (2013.01); F01D 5/3007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0163098A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1128023 A1 20010829; CN 1313705 C 20070502; CN 1406312 A 20030326; DE 50103981 D1 20041111; EP 1257732 A1 20021120; EP 1257732 B1 20041006; JP 2003524104 A 20030812; JP 4698917 B2 20110608; US 2003021686 A1 20030130; US 6755986 B2 20040629; WO 0163098 A1 20010830

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170228

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170901

2017-12-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171031

2017-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50103981

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160212

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2005-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20041006

2005-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050128

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50103981 P 20041111

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TIEMANN, PETER

2004-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STRASSBERGER, MICHAEL

2004-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ANDING, DIRK

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TIEMANN, PETER

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STRA BERGER, MICHAEL

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ANDING, DIRK

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020719

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI