Global Patent Index - EP 1257771 A1

EP 1257771 A1 2002-11-20 - COUNTER-DOOR FRAME WITH GASKET FOR DOMESTIC COOKING OVENS

Title (en)

COUNTER-DOOR FRAME WITH GASKET FOR DOMESTIC COOKING OVENS

Title (de)

TÜRRAHMEN MIT BACKOFENDICHTUNG

Title (fr)

CADRE DE CONTRE-PORTE A JOINT POUR FOUR DE MENAGE

Publication

EP 1257771 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00909625 A

Priority

IT 0000055 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0163181A1] A counter-door frame (1) for domestic cooking ovens is provided with four curved elements (3) for anchoring thereto an elastomeric gasket (2), said elements being formed by partial cutting and drawing, starting from the uncut segment of the same plate which forms the oven counter-door or front. Onto said anchoring members (3), having in cross-section substantially the shape of an L, comprising one segment (8) almost perpendicular to the counter-door plane starting from a curved line (6) cut only at the ends, is fitted a gasket (2) in elastomeric material with slots (4) obtained by removal of material through which said anchoring members are inserted into the internal cavity of the gasket. Said anchoring members are provided in the same number as the sides of the oven muffle and arranged at the relevant corners.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0163181A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0163181 A1 20010830; AU 3190300 A 20010903; DE 60016468 D1 20050105; DE 60016468 T2 20051229; EP 1257771 A1 20021120; EP 1257771 B1 20041201; PL 196577 B1 20080131; PL 356298 A1 20040628; TR 200201953 T2 20070122

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-11-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050312

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60016468 P 20050105

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: SI

2004-07-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE ES FR IT LI

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031219

2003-12-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: G.I.A.T. S.P.A.

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20020831