Global Patent Index - EP 1257902 A1

EP 1257902 A1 2002-11-20 - DOCUMENT CREATION AND SCHEDULING OF APPLICATIONS' JOBS

Title (en)

DOCUMENT CREATION AND SCHEDULING OF APPLICATIONS' JOBS

Title (de)

DOKUMENTERZEUGUNG UND ABLAUFPLANUNG FÜR JOBS VON ANWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

CREATION DE DOCUMENTS ET GESTION DE TACHES LIEES A DES DEMANDES

Publication

EP 1257902 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01910747 A

Priority

  • US 0104872 W
  • US 50546700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0161466A1] A document creation system (100) for providing an Internet service in which users (106-112) with browsers at remote locations can look for an appropriate document and format is provided. Such user fills-in-the-blanks and is returned a custom electronic document that can be printed or forwarded to another recipient. A document-creation webserver (102) attends to Internet browsers who log-on and look for a product. Such users (106-112) are qualified and handed-off to a job-master webserver (102). The hand-off provides metadata that was collected from the user (106-112), and schedules the job for the next available document processor. The jobs and metadata are stored in a database (136). Master documents are stored on disk (134). The document processor assigned to do the job collects the metadata from the database using a pointer provided in a job queue (132), and fetches a copy of the appropriate master document. The blanks in the master document copy are filled in using the metadata and/or other data, perhaps from a database (136), and the completed document is returned to the customer over the Internet (104).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/00 (2006.01); G06F 7/00 (2006.01); G06F 9/44 (2006.01); G06F 17/24 (2006.01); G06Q 10/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/248 (2013.01); G06F 17/243 (2013.01); G06Q 10/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0161466 A1 20010823; AR 030052 A1 20030813; AU 3832101 A 20010827; EP 1257902 A1 20021120; EP 1257902 A4 20060419; TW 487879 B 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WARNOCK, KEVIN, L.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WU, JOHN, SHIH-JEN

2006-06-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060420

2006-04-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060303

2006-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 17/00 20060101AFI20060227BHEP

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WARNOCK, KEVIN, L.

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WU, JOHN, SHIH-JEN

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WARNOCK, KEVIN, L.

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WU, JOHN, SHIH-JEN

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020916;LT PAYMENT 20020916;LV PAYMENT 20020916;MK PAYMENT 20020916;RO PAYMENT 20020916;SI PAYMENT 20020916