Global Patent Index - EP 1257921 A1

EP 1257921 A1 2002-11-20 - WATERMARK ENCODER AND DECODER ENABLED SOFTWARE AND DEVICES

Title (en)

WATERMARK ENCODER AND DECODER ENABLED SOFTWARE AND DEVICES

Title (de)

WASSERZEICHENCODIERER UND SOFTWARE UND EINRICHTUNGEN MIT DECODIERERAKTIVIERUNG

Title (fr)

LOGICIELS ET DISPOSITIFS ACTIVES PAR DES CODEURS ET DES DECODEURS DE FILIGRANE

Publication

EP 1257921 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01909242 A

Priority

  • US 0104812 W
  • US 18368100 P
  • US 19177800 P
  • US 63610200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0161508A1] Watermark encoders and decoders are integrated into operating systems, Internet browsers (300), media players, and other applications and devices. Such integration enables the watermark-enabled application (304) or device to provide additional functionality and information (302) available via the watermark. The watermark, for example, may link to metadata or actions related to a media object. To exploit this watermark enabled functionality, the integrated application uses a watermark decoder to access the related metadata and actions. The user interface of the integrated application is enhanced to present metadata and actions linked via the watermark. Similarly, watermark encoders may be integrated into applications to convert media objects into enhanced, watermarked objects.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 13/00; G06F 15/16; H04L 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G06T 1/00 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06F 15/16 (2006.01); G06Q 10/00 (2012.01); G06Q 30/00 (2012.01); G09C 5/00 (2006.01); H04L 9/00 (2006.01); H04N 1/387 (2006.01); H04N 7/08 (2006.01); H04N 7/081 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/02 (2013.01); G06F 17/30876 (2013.01); G06Q 10/107 (2013.01); G06F 2221/0737 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0161508 A1 20010823; WO 0161508 A9 20021031; AU 3701701 A 20010827; EP 1257921 A1 20021120; EP 1257921 A4 20060920; EP 2278497 A2 20110126; EP 2278497 A3 20130626; JP 2003523697 A 20030805; JP 2010182323 A 20100819; JP 4682276 B2 20110511; JP 5144699 B2 20130213; KR 100799090 B1 20080129; KR 100878338 B1 20090114; KR 100920320 B1 20091007; KR 20030007432 A 20030123; KR 20070086674 A 20070827; KR 20080089665 A 20081007

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-08 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1049530

2016-04-13 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20151120

2015-11-20 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2007-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061018

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061018

2006-09-20 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060818

2006-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 17/30 20060101AFI20060529BHEP

2006-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 13/00 20060101ALI20060529BHEP

2006-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 15/16 20060101ALI20060529BHEP

2006-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 9/00 20060101ALI20060529BHEP

2005-05-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIGIMARC CORPORATION

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020709

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI