Global Patent Index - EP 1257937 A1

EP 1257937 A1 2002-11-20 - CA IN A CARD

Title (en)

CA IN A CARD

Title (de)

CA IN EINER KARTE

Title (fr)

AUTORITE CERTIFIANTE DANS UNE CARTE

Publication

EP 1257937 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99929669 A

Priority

IL 9900369 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0104793A1] A secure method for generating digital documents (2) that are certified by a known authority (4). Programming an electronic device with a document issuing method that originates with the known authority (4). Program the electronic device with data identifying the owner of the device. Read a digital document (2) into the device. If the result of an identification (1) process is positive, then issuing of a digital document (2) signed by known authority (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30011 (2013.01); G06F 21/32 (2013.01); G06F 21/33 (2013.01); G06F 21/34 (2013.01); G06F 21/645 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0104793 A1 20010118; AU 4644599 A 20010130; EP 1257937 A1 20021120; EP 1257937 A4 20040609

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-19 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20140916

2014-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: III HOLDINGS 1, LLC

2014-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BARKAN, ELAD

2014-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BARKAN, NIR

2014-09-16 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2007-02-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040817

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040817

2004-06-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040423

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE