EP 1257937 A4 20040609 - CA IN A CARD
Title (en)
CA IN A CARD
Title (de)
CA IN EINER KARTE
Title (fr)
AUTORITE CERTIFIANTE DANS UNE CARTE
Publication
Application
Priority
IL 9900369 W 19990707
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO0104793A1] A secure method for generating digital documents (2) that are certified by a known authority (4). Programming an electronic device with a document issuing method that originates with the known authority (4). Program the electronic device with data identifying the owner of the device. Read a digital document (2) into the device. If the result of an identification (1) process is positive, then issuing of a digital document (2) signed by known authority (4).
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G06F 17/30 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G06F 16/93 (2018.12); G06F 21/32 (2013.01); G06F 21/33 (2013.01); G06F 21/34 (2013.01); G06F 21/645 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 5825880 A 19981020 - SUDIA FRANK W [US], et al
- [A] US 5781723 A 19980714 - YEE BENNET [US], et al
- [X] ABADI ET AL: "Authentication and Delegation with Smart-cards", SRC RESEARCH REPORT, XX, XX, vol. 67, 22 October 1990 (1990-10-22), pages 1 - 25, XP002137406
- [X] D. E. GEER, D. T. DAVIS: "Token-Mediated Certification and Electronic Commerce", USENIX, November 1996 (1996-11-01), XP002276348, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.usenix.org/publications/library/proceedings/ec96/index.html> [retrieved on 20040406]
- [A] GASSER M ET AL: "An architecture for practical delegation in a distributed system", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYMPOSIUM ON RESEARCH IN SECURITY AND PRIVACY. OAKLAND, MAY 7 - 9, 1990, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, vol. SYMP. 11, 7 May 1990 (1990-05-07), pages 20 - 30, XP010020183, ISBN: 0-8186-2060-9
- See references of WO 0104793A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 0104793 A1 20010118; AU 4644599 A 20010130; EP 1257937 A1 20021120; EP 1257937 A4 20040609
DOCDB simple family (application)
IL 9900369 W 19990707; AU 4644599 A 19990707; EP 99929669 A 19990707