Global Patent Index - EP 1257947 A1

EP 1257947 A1 2002-11-20 - INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SYSTEM WITH AUTHENTICITY CHECK

Title (en)

INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SYSTEM WITH AUTHENTICITY CHECK

Title (de)

INFORMATIONSVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM MIT AUTHENTIZITÄTSPRÜFUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE GESTION D'INFORMATION A VERIFICATION D'AUTHENTICITE

Publication

EP 1257947 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00989151 A

Priority

  • SE 0002660 W
  • SE 9904746 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0148654A1] A payment product has a writing area (6c) which is intented for a user's signature. In the writting area there is a first position-coding pattern (5) which makes possible digital recording of the signature. The first position-coding pattern is a subset of a larger second position-coding pattern. The payment product is used in a payment system which is based on electronic payment information, which has been recorded by means of the position-coding pattern, being sent to a server unit, which utilises the position-coding pattern to check that the payment information is valid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60; G06F 3/033; G06K 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/03 (2006.01); G06F 3/033 (2006.01); G06F 3/042 (2006.01); G06F 21/20 (2006.01); G06K 9/00 (2006.01); G06Q 20/00 (2012.01); G06T 7/00 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01); G07F 7/02 (2006.01); G07G 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/12 (2013.01); G06F 3/0321 (2013.01); G06K 9/00154 (2013.01); G06Q 20/04 (2013.01); G06Q 20/042 (2013.01); G06Q 20/0453 (2013.01); G06Q 20/20 (2013.01); G06Q 20/24 (2013.01); G06Q 20/3433 (2013.01); G06Q 20/3825 (2013.01); G06Q 20/403 (2013.01); G06Q 20/409 (2013.01); G07C 9/0015 (2013.01); G07F 7/02 (2013.01); G07G 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • US 5661506 A 19970826 - LAZZOUNI MOHAMED [US], et al
  • US 5852434 A 19981222 - SEKENDUR ORAL F [US]
  • DYMETMAN M; COPPERMAN M: "Intelligent paper", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, vol. 1375, March 1998 (1998-03-01), pages 392 - 406, XP002328425
  • See also references of WO 0148654A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0148654 A1 20010705; AU 2569401 A 20010709; BR 0017039 A 20021022; CA 2393928 A1 20010705; CN 1413331 A 20030423; EP 1257947 A1 20021120; JP 2003518696 A 20030610; MX PA02006342 A 20021213; RU 2002119571 A 20040310; SE 9904746 D0 19991223; SE 9904746 L 20010624

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-16 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090811

2007-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070102

2006-06-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANOTO AB

2005-08-03 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 0100 LEAPFROG ENTERPRISES INC.

- Effective date: 20050530

2005-03-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANOTO IP LIC HB

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020723

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020723;LT PAYMENT 20020723;LV PAYMENT 20020723;MK PAYMENT 20020723;RO PAYMENT 20020723;SI PAYMENT 20020723