Global Patent Index - EP 1257971 A2

EP 1257971 A2 2002-11-20 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ESTIMATING EGO-MOTION OF A MOVING VEHICLE USING SUCCESSIVE IMAGES RECORDED ALONG THE VEHICLE'S PATH OF MOTION

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ESTIMATING EGO-MOTION OF A MOVING VEHICLE USING SUCCESSIVE IMAGES RECORDED ALONG THE VEHICLE'S PATH OF MOTION

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABSCHÄTZUNG DER EGO-BEWEGUNG EINES SICH BEWEGENDEN FAHRZEUGS UNTER VERWENDUNG ENTLANG DEM BEWEGUNGSWEG DES FAHRZEUGS AUFGEZEICHNETER AUFEINANDERFOLGENDER BILDER

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'ESTIMATION DE L'AUTO-DEPLACEMENT D'UN VEHICULE EN MOUVEMENT AU MOYEN D'IMAGES SUCCESSIVES ENREGISTREES LE LONG DE LA TRAJECTOIRE DE DEPLACEMENT DU VEHICULE

Publication

EP 1257971 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00980706 A

Priority

  • US 0032143 W
  • US 16758799 P
  • US 23016600 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0139120A2] An ego-motion determination system (fig. 1, item 12) is disclosed for generating an estimate as to the ego-motion of a vehicle (fig. 1, item 10) moving along a roadway (fig. 1, item 11). The ego-motion determination system includes an image information receiver (fig. 1, item 13) and a processor (fig. 1, item 14). The image information receiver (fig. 1, item 13) is configured to receive image information relating to a series of at least two images recorded as the vehicle moves along a roadway (fig. 1, item 11). The processor is configured to process the image information received by the image receiver to generate an ego-motion estimate of the vehicle, including the translation of the vehicle in the forward direction and the rotation of the vehicle around a vertical axis as between, for example, successive images (see fig. 3)

[origin: WO0139120A2] An ego-motion determination system is disclosed for generating an estimate as to the ego-motion of a vehicle moving along a roadway. The ego-motion determination system includes an image information receiver and a processor. The image information receiver is configured to receive image information relating to a series of at least two images recorded as the vehicle moves along a roadway. The processor is configured to process the image information received by the image receiver to generate an ego-motion estimate of the vehicle, including the translation of the vehicle in the forward direction and the rotation of the vehicle around a vertical axis as between, for example, successive images.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06T 7/20; G05D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 1/00 (2006.01); G01S 11/12 (2006.01); G05D 1/02 (2006.01); G06T 7/20 (2006.01); G08G 1/16 (2006.01); G01S 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01S 11/12 (2013.01); G01S 5/163 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0139120 A2 20010531; WO 0139120 A3 20011004; AU 1793301 A 20010604; CA 2392652 A1 20010531; EP 1257971 A2 20021120; EP 1257971 A4 20050706; JP 2003515827 A 20030507

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061005

2005-10-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MOBILEYE TECHNOLOGIES, LTD.

2005-07-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050520

2005-07-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06T 7/20 A

2005-07-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 05D 1/02 B

2002-12-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04N 5/14 A, 7H 04N 7/18 B, 7G 06K 9/00 B, 7H 04B 1/66 B

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI