Global Patent Index - EP 1257999 A1

EP 1257999 A1 2002-11-20 - ELECTRICAL DEVICE WITH VOICE INPUT UNIT AND METHOD FOR VOICE INPUT

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL DEVICE WITH VOICE INPUT UNIT AND METHOD FOR VOICE INPUT

Title (de)

ELEKTROGERÄT MIT SPRACHEINGABEEINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR SPRACHEINGABE

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ELECTRIQUE A UNITE DE COMMANDE VOCALE, ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE VOCALE

Publication

EP 1257999 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01911583 A

Priority

  • DE 10006240 A
  • EP 0101146 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0159763A1] An arrangement, comprising an electrically operated device, a voice input unit (19) and a voice processing unit (21), which derives control signals from spoken input commands, for the control of the function of the equipment (1, 13), is known. The aim of the invention is to improve the voice recognition, whereby an operating status recognition unit (23) is provided, which recognises the operating status (BS1, BS2, ...) of the household equipment (1, 13, 35) or other noise sources (13, 35) and reports to the voice processing unit (21). The voice processing unit (21) only uses an interfering noise correction when a noise source is switched on.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 15/26; G10L 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 15/26 (2006.01); G10L 15/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/2021 (2013.01); G10L 15/26 (2013.01); G10L 2015/223 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0159763 A1 20010816; DE 10006240 A1 20010816; EP 1257999 A1 20021120; US 2003023448 A1 20030130; US 6778964 B2 20040817

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061031

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-04-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HAS, UWE

2003-04-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GEIGER, DIETER

2003-04-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HABERLANDER, RAINER

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HAS, UWE

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GEIGER, DIETER

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HABERLANDER, RAINER

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR