Global Patent Index - EP 1258009 A1

EP 1258009 A1 2002-11-20 - DOUBLE-CHAMBER CONTAINER FOR TRANSPORTING OR STORING RADIOACTIVE MATERIALS

Title (en)

DOUBLE-CHAMBER CONTAINER FOR TRANSPORTING OR STORING RADIOACTIVE MATERIALS

Title (de)

DOPPELGEFÄSSIGER BEHÄLTER ZUM TRANSPORT BZW. ZUR LAGERUNG RADIOAKTIVER MATERIALIEN

Title (fr)

CONTENEUR A DOUBLE ENCEINTE POUR LE TRANSPORT OU LE STOCKAGE DE MATIERES RADIOACTIVES

Publication

EP 1258009 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01909884 A

Priority

  • FR 0100534 W
  • FR 0002314 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0163621A1] The invention concerns a container for transporting or storing radioactive materials comprising two separate confinement chambers, nested one in the other. The outer confinement chamber comprises at least an inside part of a body (10), a lid (12) and sealing members (16) interposed between them. The inner confinement chamber comprises a container (18) a plug (22) and sealing members (24) interposed between them. A flange (18b) of the container is supported against a shoulder (20) of the body (10). The plug (22) is pressed against the flange (18b) by fixing members (28, 30) advantageously anchored in the body (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21F 5/008

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21C 19/06 (2006.01); G21F 5/008 (2006.01); G21F 5/12 (2006.01); G21F 9/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21F 5/008 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/301 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/501 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/60 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/303 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/304 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0163621A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0163621 A1 20010830; AR 029473 A1 20030702; BR 0108665 A 20021203; CA 2399262 A1 20010830; CZ 20022845 A3 20030212; EP 1258009 A1 20021120; FR 2805655 A1 20010831; FR 2805655 B1 20020719; JP 2003524786 A 20030819; KR 20030011776 A 20030211; US 2003010938 A1 20030116

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030823

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MICHELS, LAURENT

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MILET, LAURENT

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MICHELS, LAURENT

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MILET, LAURENT

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR