Global Patent Index - EP 1258018 A1

EP 1258018 A1 2002-11-20 - REAGENTS, METHODS AND KITS FOR DETECTING i BACILLUS THURINGIENSIS /i PROTEINS

Title (en)

REAGENTS, METHODS AND KITS FOR DETECTING i BACILLUS THURINGIENSIS /i PROTEINS

Title (de)

REAGENZIEN, VERFAHREN UND KIT ZUR ERKENNUNG VON /I-PROTEINEN DES I-BAZILLUS THURINGIENSIS

Title (fr)

REACTIFS, PROCEDES ET KITS DE DETECTION DES PROTEINES i BACILLUS THURINGIENSIS /i

Publication

EP 1258018 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00988118 A

Priority

  • US 0034321 W
  • US 17096199 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0145122A1] Epitopes, antibodies, methods and kits for the detection of Bt proteins in a sample are provided. The proteins to be detected are the Bt proteins known to those skilled in the art as the Cry1 Ab and Cry1 Ac proteins. The epitopes are antigenic peptides of these Bt proteins and are immunoreactive with the monoclonal antibodies 113L2 and 113I1. The epitopes are isolated or synthesized and administered to animals to produce anti-Bt monoclonal and polyclonal antibodies having superior sensitivity for Bt proteins. The antibodies are useful in immunoassay methods for the detection of genetically modified organisms that have been engineered to include a Bt gene.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 16/12; G01N 33/569

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/12 (2006.01); G01N 33/569 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/56911 (2013.01); C07K 16/1278 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0145122 A1 20010621; AU 2436201 A 20010625; BR 0016458 A 20040831; CA 2394205 A1 20010621; EP 1258018 A1 20021120; EP 1258018 A4 20040616

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-05-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050316

2004-06-16 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-06-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 16/12 A

2004-06-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/569 B

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020712

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI