Global Patent Index - EP 1258024 A1

EP 1258024 A1 2002-11-20 - PLASMA DISPLAY PANEL

Title (en)

PLASMA DISPLAY PANEL

Title (de)

PLASMAANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

ECRAN A PLASMA

Publication

EP 1258024 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00971869 A

Priority

  • KR 0001225 W
  • KR 19990047639 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0131675A1] A PDP improves discharge efficiency by reducing a discharge voltage and increasing a volume of a plasma. The PDP includes an opaque metal fence-type electrode electrically connected to first and second electrodes in each pixel of an upper substrate, and extended toward the second substrate. As a result, the discharge voltage is reduced by minimizing a loss of the plasma generated during the discharge in an individual unit pixel. As the electrode area is widened, a plasma formation space is increased and plasma energy loss is decreased, thereby performing stabilized space discharge. Moreover, interaction between adjacent pixels is prevented by individualizing the unit pixels by sidewalls. A size of the pixels is decreased to obtain a high quality screen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 17/49; H01J 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 11/12 (2012.01); H01J 11/22 (2012.01); H01J 11/24 (2012.01); H01J 11/26 (2012.01); H01J 11/34 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 11/12 (2013.01); H01J 11/24 (2013.01); H01J 2211/245 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0131675 A1 20010503; CN 1156872 C 20040707; CN 1384971 A 20021211; DE 60044729 D1 20100902; EP 1258024 A1 20021120; EP 1258024 A4 20051109; EP 1258024 B1 20100721; JP 2003513416 A 20030408; JP 3663416 B2 20050622; KR 100651822 B1 20061130; KR 20010039312 A 20010515

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60044729

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131003

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101027

2011-08-18 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60044729

- Effective date: 20110426

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110426

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101027

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100721

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100721

2010-11-24 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20100721

2010-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60044729 P 20100902

2010-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2010-07-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-01-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ORION PDP CO., LTD.

2006-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ORION PDP CO., LTD.

2005-11-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050928

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020525

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE