Global Patent Index - EP 1258036 A1

EP 1258036 A1 2002-11-20 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FERROELECTRIC LAYER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FERROELECTRIC LAYER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FERROELEKTRISCHEN SCHICHT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE COUCHE FERRO-ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1258036 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01911688 A

Priority

  • DE 10008617 A
  • EP 0102035 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0163658A1] The invention relates to a method for producing a ferroelectric layer. According to the invention, the application of an outer electrical field facilitates the crystallisation of the material in accordance with a predetermined direction. In this way, it is possible to produce ferroelectric layers whose domains are preferably aligned in such a way that their polarisation vectors are positioned perpendicularly to the electrodes of the storage capacitor in a storage cell. As a result, the overall polarisation vector for the domains runs essentially parallel to the field of the storage capacitor while the storage device is in operation and the polarisation produced has a correspondingly high level of remanence. The level of the signal that can be read out of the storage capacitors is also correspondingly high.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/316

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/02 (2006.01); H01L 21/316 (2006.01); H01L 21/8246 (2006.01); H01L 27/115 (2006.01); H01L 21/314 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 27/11502 (2013.01); H01L 21/31691 (2013.01); H01L 27/11507 (2013.01); H01L 28/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0163658A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE GB IE LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0163658 A1 20010830; DE 10008617 A1 20010906; EP 1258036 A1 20021120; TW 525196 B 20030321; US 2003138977 A1 20030724; US 6790676 B2 20040914

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090901

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061012

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB IE LI

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CERVA, HANS

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HINTERMAIER, FRANK

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHINDLER, GUENTHER

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WINTERAUER, FRANZ

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARTNER, WALTER

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOEPFNER, JOACHIM

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEINRICH, VOLKER

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020820

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR