Global Patent Index - EP 1258065 A1

EP 1258065 A1 2002-11-20 - HIGH POWER DISTRIBUTED FEEDBACK RIDGE WAVEGUIDE LASER

Title (en)

HIGH POWER DISTRIBUTED FEEDBACK RIDGE WAVEGUIDE LASER

Title (de)

RIPPENWELLENLEITER-LASER MIT VERTEILTER RÜCKKOPPELUNG UND HOHER AUSGANGSLEISTUNG

Title (fr)

LASER DE FORTE PUISSANCE AVEC UN GUIDE D'ONDES EN RUBAN A RETROACTION REPARTIE

Publication

EP 1258065 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01920104 A

Priority

  • US 0102019 W
  • US 17691500 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0155814A2] An RF-photonics integrated communications module (100) including: a plurality of RF input channels (111,121,131 and 141); a plurality of modulators (110,120,130 and 140) each being responsive to one of the RF input channels; and, a plurality of photonic output channels (114, 124, 134 and 144) coupled to the modulators via a switching network. The switching network includes a plurality of resonating elements coupled between the modulators and the output channels to selectively apply outputs of the modulators to the output channels.

[origin: WO0155814A2] An RF-photonics integrated communications module including: a plurality of RF input channels; a plurality of modulators each being responsive to one of the RF input channels; and, a plurality of photonic output channels coupled to the modulators via a switching network. The switching network includes a plurality of resonating elements coupled between the modulators and the output channels to selectively apply outputs of the modulators to the output channels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01S 5/30; H01S 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/225 (2006.01); G02F 1/01 (2006.01); G02F 1/21 (2006.01); G02F 1/313 (2006.01); H01Q 3/26 (2006.01); H01Q 23/00 (2006.01); H01S 5/10 (2006.01); H01S 5/12 (2006.01); H01S 5/20 (2006.01); H01S 5/323 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 23/00 (2013.01); G02F 1/2257 (2013.01); G02F 1/3132 (2013.01); G02F 1/3137 (2013.01); H01Q 3/2682 (2013.01); H01S 5/12 (2013.01); G02F 1/011 (2013.01); G02F 1/225 (2013.01); G02F 2001/212 (2013.01); G02F 2201/16 (2013.01); G02F 2203/05 (2013.01); G02F 2203/15 (2013.01); G02F 2203/585 (2013.01); H01S 5/1039 (2013.01); H01S 5/20 (2013.01); H01S 5/2036 (2013.01); H01S 5/323 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0155814 A2 20010802; WO 0155814 A3 20020207; AU 4142401 A 20010731; AU 4719201 A 20010731; AU 6290101 A 20010807; CA 2398833 A1 20010726; EP 1258065 A1 20021120; EP 1258065 A4 20060830; JP 2003520455 A 20030702; WO 0153881 A1 20010726; WO 0154240 A1 20010726

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-06-17 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150520

2015-05-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G02F 1/01 20060101ALI20150413BHEP

2015-05-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01S 5/10 20060101ALI20150413BHEP

2015-05-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G02F 1/21 20060101ALI20150413BHEP

2015-05-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01Q 23/00 20060101ALI20150413BHEP

2015-05-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G02F 1/313 20060101ALI20150413BHEP

2015-05-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01S 5/323 20060101ALI20150413BHEP

2015-05-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01S 5/12 20060101ALI20150413BHEP

2015-05-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01S 5/20 20060101ALI20150413BHEP

2015-05-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01Q 3/26 20060101ALI20150413BHEP

2015-05-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G02F 1/225 20060101AFI20150413BHEP

2009-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091008

2006-08-30 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060728

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRUMPF PHOTONICS, INC.

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020813

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI