Global Patent Index - EP 1258126 A1

EP 1258126 A1 2002-11-20 - METHOD FOR ACCESSING INTERNET WEB PAGES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR ACCESSING INTERNET WEB PAGES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ZUGRIFF AUF INTERNET-SEITEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ACCES A DES PAGES INTERNET

Publication

EP 1258126 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01911616 A

Priority

  • DE 10005337 A
  • EP 0101306 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0160015A1] The internet, also referred to as the World Wide Web (WWW), is an established global information system in which many millions of different internet web pages can be accessed via a PC internet connection to the internet or WWW, and the individual who is surfing the internet can be provided with sought after information. The invention relates to a method for accessing internet web pages, whereby the internet web page can only be accessed via internet connections that dispose of a certain address and/or of a certain top-level domain.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01); H04L 29/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 63/10 (2013.01); H04L 63/168 (2013.01); H04L 29/12594 (2013.01); H04L 29/12783 (2013.01); H04L 61/30 (2013.01); H04L 61/35 (2013.01); H04L 69/329 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0160015A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0160015 A1 20010816; AU 4059701 A 20010820; EP 1258126 A1 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-25 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20150716

2015-07-16 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2007-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PAN AMP GMBH

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061220

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020909

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI