Global Patent Index - EP 1258203 A2

EP 1258203 A2 2002-11-20 - Slider for a zip fastener

Title (en)

Slider for a zip fastener

Title (de)

Schieber für Reissverschluss

Title (fr)

Curseur pour fermeture à glissière

Publication

EP 1258203 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02396064 A

Priority

FI 20011049 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a slider for a zip fastener comprising a pull tab (15) and a slider body (20) comprising a top plate (21) and a bottom plate (23) and a wedge-shaped part (22) connecting them as well as a tab holder (25) for attachment of a loop of the pull tab (15) of the zip fastener slider or a loop thereof made into a shape of a clamp part. A tail part (26) of the tab holder (25) of the zip fastener slider (20) extends outside the slider body (20) and a throat (24) such that between the tail part (26) of the tab holder (25) and the end of the top plate (21) of the slider body (20) there remains a threading gap/threading point (28) through which the pull tab (15) can be threaded into connection with the tab holder (25). The pull tab (15) is prevented from coming off the slider body (20) by means of the shaping of the tab holder (25) such that the locking of the zip fastener slider (20) is placed, as viewed in a horizontal plane, outside the rear of the top plate (21) of the slider (20) or to operate, as viewed in a horizontal plane, from outside the rear of the top plate. The invention also relates to a slider (20) for the zip fastener which comprises members for producing a spring effect, in which connection compression locking is provided between a retainer head (17) of the zip fastener slider and the zip fastener (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 19/26; A44B 19/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 19/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 19/305 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258203 A2 20021120; EP 1258203 A3 20040102; FI 110753 B 20030331; FI 20011049 A0 20010517; FI 20011049 A 20021118

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050917

2005-06-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050506

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 44B 19/26 A

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 44B 19/30 B

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI