Global Patent Index - EP 1258209 A2

EP 1258209 A2 2002-11-20 - Adjustment mechanism for an arm-rest of a chair

Title (en)

Adjustment mechanism for an arm-rest of a chair

Title (de)

Verstellmechanismus insbesondere für eine Armlehne eines Sitzmöbel

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de réglage pour un accoudoir d'une chaise

Publication

EP 1258209 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010848 A

Priority

DE 20108247 U

Abstract (en)

The adjustment mechanism, in particular, for stepwise adjustment of an arm rest of a seat relative to the seat base comprises a sleeve (13) which is attached to the arm rest, and slides over a tubular member (17.1) attached to the seat base. The tubular member accommodates an assembly of adjustment elements including an adjustment strut (25) and a stop system.

Abstract (de)

Um einen Verstellmechanismus für ein gegenüber einem Gestell zu verstellenden Teil, insbesondere für eine gegenüber dem Untergestell eines Sitzmöbels zu verstellende Armlehne, die mit einer mit dem zu verstellenden Teil verbundenen Aufnahmehülse 14 versehen ist, die einen gestellfesten Ansatz 17.1 übergreifend gegenüber diesem verstellbar ist, wobei zur schrittweisen Verstellung ein Rastmechanismus vorgesehen ist, so weiter zu bilden, dass sie vielseitig einsetzbar und einfach an die unterschiedlichen Gegebenheiten anpassbar, die wirtschaftlich herstellbar, und die sicher einsetzbar ist, wobei insbesondere eine Armlehne versehen mit einer derartigen Verstellmechanik angegeben werden soll, ist der Ansatz 17.1 zumindest teilweise als Rohr ausgebildet, in das eine Verstellkartusche 20; 25 mit hohlem Innenraum fest eingesetzt ist, in die ein mit dem zu verstellenden Teil verbundenes Verstellschwert 30 so eingeführt ist, dass es gegenüber der Verstellkartusche 20; 25 verschiebbar ist, wobei die Rastmechanik innerhalb der Verstellkartusche 20; 25 angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 20108247 U1 20020620; AT 310428 T 20051215; EP 1258209 A2 20021120; EP 1258209 A3 20030917; EP 1258209 B1 20051123; ES 2253475 T3 20060601

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170515

2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-03-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180131

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150516

2016-06-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160627

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150515

2016-04-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150515

2016-02-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150515

2016-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 310428 T

- Effective date: 20150515

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140520

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140519

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140520

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-07-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2253475 T3

2006-03-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060222

2005-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT NL

2005-11-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT NL

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031220

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI