Global Patent Index - EP 1258210 A2

EP 1258210 A2 2002-11-20 - Synchronised mechanism for a coupled seat- and backrest-movement in an office chair

Title (en)

Synchronised mechanism for a coupled seat- and backrest-movement in an office chair

Title (de)

Synchronmechanik für eine korrelierte Sitz-Rückenlehnen-Bewegung eines Bürostuhles

Title (fr)

Mécanisme synchronisé pour un mouvement correlé entre une siège et un dossier d'une chaise de bureau

Publication

EP 1258210 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009186 A

Priority

DE 10125994 A

Abstract (en)

The joint between the base and seat supports (2,6) consists of a slotted (25) twist joint (22). The slot also contains the seat support (6) bearing pin (26) so the joint (22) has to be moved horizontally back in the slot to lower the seat support. The joint as such is integrated with the front joint (12) between the front rod (8) and backrest support (7) and the interval (a) between joints (12 and 13) and rods (7,8) equals the length (L) of the rear rod (10) and is greater than the length (L8) of the front rod (8).

Abstract (de)

Eine Synchronmechanik für die korrelierte Sitz-Rückenlehnen-Bewegung eines Bürostuhls ist versehen mit einem auf einer Stuhlsäule (4) plazierbaren Basisträger (2), einem um eine Querachse schwenkbaren, bei seinem vorderen Ende (21) gelenkig mit dem Basisträger (2) verbundenen Sitzträger (6) und einem ebenfalls um eine Querachse schwenkbaren, gelenkig mit dem Basisträger (2) verbundenen Rückenlehnenträger (7). Letzterer ist mit dem Sitzträger (6) derart gekoppelt, daß eine Schwenkbewegung der Rückenlehne nach hinten eine Absenkbewegung des rückwärtigen Bereichs des Sitzträgers (6) induziert. Das Gelenk zwischen Basisträger (2) und Sitzträger (6) ist derart als Dreh-Schiebe-Gelenk (22) ausgebildet, daß der Absenkbewegung des Sitzträgers (6) eine horizontale Schiebebewegung überlagert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/032

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/032 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03255 (2013.01); A47C 1/03205 (2013.01); A47C 1/03272 (2013.01); A47C 1/03294 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258210 A2 20021120; EP 1258210 A3 20040114; EP 1258210 B1 20060315; DE 10125994 A1 20021121; DE 50206055 D1 20060511; US 2002171276 A1 20021121; US 6886888 B2 20050503

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100425

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101101

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100425

2010-11-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101101

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090617

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061218

2006-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206055 P 20060511

2006-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060315

2006-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2006-03-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2004-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040130

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI