Global Patent Index - EP 1258215 A2

EP 1258215 A2 2002-11-20 - Seat convertible into a bed

Title (en)

Seat convertible into a bed

Title (de)

In ein Bett umwandelbares Sitzmöbel

Title (fr)

Meuble d'assise transformable en lit

Publication

EP 1258215 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02450094 A

Priority

AT 39901 U

Abstract (en)

The seating furniture, which can be converted into a bed, has a quadrilateral interconnecting linkage between the seat (1) and the backrest (2). The linkage allows the seat to be swung upwards and lay the seat an backrest on a common lying plane. An additional upholstery (18) rests on a laying surface (17) behind the backrest, to increase the lying surface in terms of width or length.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem in ein Bett umwandelbaren Sitzmöbel, ist dessen Sitz- und Rückenpolster (1, 2) durch einen ein Gelenkviereck aufweisenden Beschlag miteinander verbunden, mittels dem der Sitzpolster (1) hochschwenkbar ist, und der ein Bewegen von Sitz- und Rückenpolster (1, 2) in eine gemeinsame Liegeebene ermöglicht. Hinter dem Rückenpolster (2) ist eine Auflage (17) für ein in der Liegestellung die Liegefläche ergänzendes Zusatzpolster (18) angeordnet. Dadurch kann die Liegelänge bzw. Liegebreite vergrößert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 17/16; A47C 17/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 17/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 17/1756 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

AT 2046 U1 19980427 - HOPPE KG HODRY METALLFAB [AT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258215 A2 20021120; EP 1258215 A3 20030917; AT 5000 U1 20020225; HU 0201681 A2 20031229; HU 0201681 D0 20020729; PL 353655 A1 20021118

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-07-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HODRY METALLWARENFABRIK R.HOPPE GES.M.B.H & CO. KG

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI