Global Patent Index - EP 1258246 A2

EP 1258246 A2 2002-11-20 - Controlled release oxycodone compositions

Title (en)

Controlled release oxycodone compositions

Title (de)

Oxycodonhaltige Zubereitungen mit gesteuerter Wirkstoffabgabe

Title (fr)

Compositions d'oxycodone à libération controlée

Publication

EP 1258246 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02008249 A

Priority

  • EP 96102992 A
  • EP 92925406 A
  • US 80054991 A

Abstract (en)

A method for substantially reducing the range in daily dosages required to control pain in approximately 80% of patients is disclosed whereby an oral solid controlled release dosage formulation having from about 10 to about 40 mg of oxycodone or a salt thereof is administered to a patient. The formulation provides a mean maximum plasma concentration of oxycodone from about 6 to about 60 ng/ml from a mean of about 2 to about 4.5 hours after administration, and a mean minimum plasma concentration from about 3 to about 30 ng/ml from about 10 to about 14 hours after repeated "q12h" (i.e., every 12 hours) administration through steady-state conditions. Another embodiment is directed to a method for substantially reducing the range in daily dosages required to control pain in substantially all patients. The figure is a graph showing the mean plasma oxycodone concentration for a 10 mg controlled release oxycodone formulation prepared in accordance with the present invention and a study reference standard. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/485; A61K 9/20; A61K 9/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/16 (2006.01); A61K 9/20 (2006.01); A61K 9/22 (2006.01); A61K 9/26 (2006.01); A61K 9/28 (2006.01); A61K 9/30 (2006.01); A61K 9/58 (2006.01); A61K 31/485 (2006.01); A61K 47/30 (2006.01); A61K 47/32 (2006.01); A61K 47/38 (2006.01); A61P 25/04 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A61K (2006.01); A61P (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/2013 (2013.01); A61K 9/2027 (2013.01); A61K 9/2054 (2013.01); A61K 9/2081 (2013.01); A61K 9/5015 (2013.01); A61K 31/485 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9310765 A1 19930610; AT 144418 T 19961115; AT 226822 T 20021115; AT 261725 T 20040415; AT 261726 T 20040415; AT 261727 T 20040415; AT 332691 T 20060815; AT 360421 T 20070515; AT 365041 T 20070715; AT 454150 T 20100115; AU 3147693 A 19930628; AU 657027 B2 19950223; BG 61753 B1 19980529; BG 97973 A 19940527; BR 9205498 A 19940607; CA 2098738 A1 19930528; CA 2098738 C 19990817; CN 1087262 A 19940601; CN 1165307 C 20040908; CN 1245958 C 20060322; CN 1364458 A 20020821; CZ 286913 B6 20000816; CZ 292849 B6 20031217; CZ 298499 B6 20071017; CZ 300183 B6 20090311; CZ 9301764 A3 19940413; DE 69214802 D1 19961128; DE 69214802 T2 19970507; DE 69232837 D1 20021205; DE 69232837 T2 20030618; DE 69232837 T3 20140102; DE 69233326 D1 20040422; DE 69233326 T2 20050310; DE 69233327 D1 20040422; DE 69233327 T2 20050310; DE 69233328 D1 20040422; DE 69233328 T2 20050310; DE 69233328 T3 20080207; DE 69233640 D1 20060824; DE 69233640 T2 20070614; DE 69233691 D1 20070606; DE 69233691 T2 20080124; DE 69233699 D1 20070802; DE 69233699 T2 20080228; DE 69233778 D1 20100225; DE 9219234 U1 20010329; DK 0576643 T3 19970421; DK 0576643 T5 20041122; DK 0722730 T3 20021125; DK 0722730 T4 20131118; DK 0722730 T5 20030331; DK 1258246 T3 20040705; DK 1325746 T3 20061106; DK 1327445 T3 20040726; DK 1327446 T3 20040802; DK 1327446 T4 20071217; DK 1438959 T3 20070917; DK 1502592 T3 20071022; DK 1810679 T3 20100208; DK 200000364 U3 20010323; EP 0576643 A1 19940105; EP 0576643 A4 19940318; EP 0576643 B1 19961023; EP 0722730 A1 19960724; EP 0722730 B1 20021030; EP 0722730 B2 20130807; EP 1258246 A2 20021120; EP 1258246 A3 20030108; EP 1258246 B1 20040317; EP 1325746 A1 20030709; EP 1325746 B1 20060712; EP 1327445 A1 20030716; EP 1327445 B1 20040317; EP 1327446 A1 20030716; EP 1327446 B1 20040317; EP 1327446 B2 20070822; EP 1438959 A1 20040721; EP 1438959 B1 20070425; EP 1502592 A1 20050202; EP 1502592 B1 20070620; EP 1774969 A2 20070418; EP 1774969 A3 20071003; EP 1810679 A2 20070725; EP 1810679 A3 20071003; EP 1810679 B1 20100106; EP 2106796 A2 20091007; EP 2106796 A3 20091104; EP 2106797 A2 20091007; EP 2106797 A3 20091104; EP 2243484 A2 20101027; EP 2243484 A3 20120111; EP 2289517 A2 20110302; EP 2289517 A3 20120704; EP 2289517 B1 20140507; EP 2340833 A2 20110706; EP 2340833 A3 20120912; ES 2096781 T3 19970316; ES 2186737 T3 20030516; ES 2186737 T5 20140117; ES 2213720 T3 20040901; ES 2215983 T3 20041016; ES 2215984 T3 20041016; ES 2215984 T5 20080316; ES 2268189 T3 20070316; ES 2286523 T3 20071201; ES 2287625 T3 20071216; ES 2339392 T3 20100519; FI 113152 B 20040315; FI 116658 B 20060131; FI 118250 B 20070914; FI 118251 B 20070914; FI 118252 B 20070914; FI 20031888 A 20031222; FI 20031889 A 20031222; FI 20031890 A 20031222; FI 20031891 A 20031222; FI 933330 A0 19930723; FI 933330 A 19930723; GR 3022273 T3 19970430; HK 1051803 A1 20050304; HK 1058474 A1 20070223; HK 1059209 A1 20041217; HK 1059210 A1 20041217; HK 1068004 A1 20071012; HK 1073255 A1 20080125; HU 0302920 D0 20031128; HU 0303097 D0 20031128; HU 0400224 D0 20040428; HU 0400225 D0 20040428; HU 0400226 D0 20040428; HU 0400227 D0 20040428; HU 0400357 D0 20040428; HU 0401532 D0 20040928; HU 224075 B1 20050530; HU 226929 B1 20100301; HU 227514 B1 20110728; HU 227515 B1 20110728; HU 227516 B1 20110728; HU 227517 B1 20110728; HU 227518 B1 20110728; HU 227815 B1 20120328; HU 228058 B1 20120928; HU 9301517 D0 19930928; HU T69401 A 19950928; IL 103909 A 19960912; IL 103909 D0 19930404; JP 2002370983 A 20021224; JP 3375960 B2 20030210; JP 4016074 B2 20071205; JP H06507645 A 19940901; MX 9302968 A 19940531; NO 20041662 A 19930924; NO 20041667 A 19930924; NO 20041939 A 19930527; NO 20043264 A 19930924; NO 307028 B1 20000131; NO 307028 B3 20090525; NO 318890 B1 20050518; NO 322378 B1 20060925; NO 323334 B1 20070326; NO 325483 B1 20080513; NO 932661 A 19930924; NO 932661 D0 19930723; NO 996447 A 19930924; NO 996447 D0 19991223; PH 31679 A 19990118; PL 172236 B1 19970829; PL 173574 B1 19980331; PT 1258246 E 20040630; PT 1325746 E 20061130; PT 1327445 E 20040730; PT 1327446 E 20040630; PT 1438959 E 20070719; PT 1502592 E 20070917; PT 1810679 E 20100218; PT 722730 E 20030331; RO 115112 B1 19991130; RS 50054 B 20081128; RS 50055 B 20081128; RS 50056 B 20081128; RU 2122411 C1 19981127; SK 280295 B6 19991108; SK 92293 A3 19940406; US 2001008639 A1 20010719; US 2002018810 A1 20020214; US 2003099704 A1 20030529; US 2004096500 A1 20040520; US 2004105887 A1 20040603; US 2004185098 A1 20040923; US 2006057210 A1 20060316; US 2006099255 A1 20060511; US 2006165791 A1 20060727; US 2006165792 A1 20060727; US 5266331 A 19931130; US 5508042 A 19960416; US 5549912 A 19960827; YU 35893 A 19970307; YU 49495 B 20060817; ZA 9209227 B 19930712

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-25 [REG GB S75Z] AMENDMENT OF PATENT IN INFRINGEMENT OR REVOCATION PROCEEDINGS BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 75/PATENTS ACT 1977)

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20121126

2014-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140827

2014-03-06 [REG DE R040] WITHDRAWAL/REFUSAL OF REVOCATION ACTION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69233326

- Effective date: 20140109

2014-01-09 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69233326

2013-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20121125

2013-08-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-04-11 [REG DE R039] REVOCATION ACTION FILED

- Document: DE 69233326

- Effective date: 20130116

2013-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20121204

2013-02-06 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Document: GR 20040401077

- Effective date: 20121126

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20121124

2013-01-16 [REG DE R008] CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT

- Document: DE 69233326

2013-01-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 261725 T

- Effective date: 20121125

2013-01-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-12-19 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20121124

2012-12-05 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20121125

2012-12-04 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: MAXIMUM VALIDITY LIMIT REACHED

- Effective date: 20121125

2012-11-30 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *MUNDIPHARMA CVA

- Effective date: 20121125

2012-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-11-27 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69233326

2012-11-26 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

2012-11-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69233326

2012-04-26 [REG DE R040] WITHDRAWAL/REFUSAL OF REVOCATION ACTION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69233326

- Effective date: 20110818

2012-04-25 [REG GB S72Z] CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977)

- Free text: APPEAL DISMISSED; APPEAL LODGED 13 FEBRUARY 2009 AGAINST COURT ORDER DATED 10 FEBRUARY 2009 DISMISSED IN RELATION TO PATENT VALIDITY BY ORDER OF THE COURT OF APPEAL DATED 1 APRIL 2009 (A3/2009/0297/0310 AND 0311). LEAVE TO APPEAL TO THE HOUSE OF LORDS REFUSED.

2012-03-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20111110

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20111123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111115

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20111130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20111118

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20111114

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20111118

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20111128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20111125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20111124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-10-26 [REG GB S72Z] CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977)

- Free text: APPEAL LODGED 13 FEBRUARY 2009 AGAINST COURT ORDER DATED 10 FEBRUARY 2009 (2009/0297)

2011-10-26 [REG GB S72Z] CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977)

- Free text: CLAIM FOR REVOCATION LODGED 18 DECEMBER 2007 DISMISSED BY COURT ORDER DATED 10 FEBRUARY 2009 (HC 07 C03453), STAYED PENDING APPEAL.

2011-08-18 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69233326

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA LABORATORIES GMBH

- Free text: MUNDIPHARMA LABORATORIES GMBH#ST. ALBAN-RHEINWEG 74#4020 BASEL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- MUNDIPHARMA LABORATORIES GMBH#ST. ALBAN-RHEINWEG 74#4020 BASEL (CH)

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101112

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-07-23 [REG GB S75] AMENDMENT OF PATENT IN INFRINGEMENT OR REVOCATION PROCEEDINGS BEFORE THE COMPTROLLER (SECT. 75/PATENTS ACT 1977)

2008-01-30 [REG GB 7276] COUNTER CLAIM FOR REVOCATION LODGED IN THE PAT. COURT (SECTION 72)

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *MUNDIPHARMA CVACAMPUS MECHELEN, SCHALIENHOEVEDREE

- Effective date: 20050331

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *MUNDIPHARMA CVA

- Effective date: 20050331

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *MUNDIPHARMA CVACAMPUS MECHELEN, SCHALIENHOEVEDREE

- Effective date: 20050331

2007-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2007-08-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20070203

2007-06-06 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20070203

2006-09-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA PHARMACEUTICALS BV

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-07-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: THE PURDUE PHARMA COMPANY

2006-07-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA GMBH

2006-07-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NAPP PHARMACEUTICAL HOLDINGS LIMITED

2006-07-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NORPHARMA A/S

2006-07-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA PHARMACEUTICALS S.R.L.

2006-07-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA LABORATORIES GMBH

2006-07-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA PHARMACEUTICALS BV

2006-07-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA AB

2006-07-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA AG

2006-07-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA FARMACEUTICA LDA

2006-07-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA PHARMACEUTICALS SL

2006-07-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA GESMBH

2006-07-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA CVA

2005-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA PHARMACEUTICALS BV

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-10-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: THE PURDUE PHARMA COMPANY

2005-10-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA GMBH

2005-10-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NAPP PHARMACEUTICAL HOLDINGS LIMITED

2005-10-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NORPHARMA A/S

2005-10-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA PHARMACEUTICALS S.R.L.

2005-10-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA LABORATORIES GMBH

2005-10-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA PHARMACEUTICALS BV

2005-10-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA AB

2005-10-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA AG

2005-10-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA FARMACEUTICA LDA

2005-10-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA PHARMACEUTICALS SL

2005-10-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA GESMBH

2005-10-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA CVA

2005-10-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2005-07-29 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PURDUE PHARMA L. P., US

- Effective date: 20050520

2005-07-29 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NORPHARMA A/S, DK

- Effective date: 20050520

2005-07-29 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA FARMACEUTICA LDA., PT

- Effective date: 20050520

2005-06-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA PHARMACEUTICALS B.V.

2005-06-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: PURDUE PHARMA L.P.

2005-04-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-04-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PURDUE PHARMA LP

- Free text: THE PURDUE PHARMA COMPANY#ONE STAMFORD FORUM#STAMFORD, CT 06901 (US) -TRANSFER TO- PURDUE PHARMA LP#ONE STAMFORD FORUM#STAMFORD, CT 06901 (US)

2005-04-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MUNDIPHARMA LABORATORIES GMBH

- Free text: PURDUE PHARMA LP#ONE STAMFORD FORUM#STAMFORD, CT 06901 (US) -TRANSFER TO- MUNDIPHARMA LABORATORIES GMBH#ST. ALBAN-RHEINWEG 74#4020 BASEL (CH)

2005-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: GRUENENTHAL GMBH -STABSTELLE PATENTE-

2005-03-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *MUNDIPHARMA CVACAMPUS MECHELEN, SCHALIENHOEVEDREE

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *MUNDIPHARMA CVA

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *MUNDIPHARMA CVACAMPUS MECHELEN, SCHALIENHOEVEDREE

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-04 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1051803

2005-03-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-02-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GRUENENTHAL GMBH

- Effective date: 20041217

2005-02-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-03 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES

2004-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2213720 T3

2004-07-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-07-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-06-30 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-05-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040401077

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69233326 P 20040422

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0722730 P

2004-03-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0576643 P

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE PURDUE PHARMA COMPANY

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/485 A

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 9/20 B

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 9/28 B

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 25/04 B

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020418

2002-11-20 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 576643

2002-11-20 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 722730

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE