Global Patent Index - EP 1258293 A2

EP 1258293 A2 2002-11-20 - Apparatus for spraying a multicomponent mix

Title (en)

Apparatus for spraying a multicomponent mix

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Spritzen einer Mehrkomponentenmischung

Title (fr)

Appareil de pulvérisation d'un mélange à plusieurs composants

Publication

EP 1258293 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02405359 A

Priority

CH 9072001 A

Abstract (en)

The apparatus to spray a paint mixture, of a number of components, has a spray gun where the components are mixed. A mixing chamber (24), in a truncated cone shape, mixes one component (B) with compressed air. A second chamber (7), in a truncated cone shape, mixes the blend of compressed air and its component with another component (A). The whole mixture is sprayed through the slit (6) or a jet (10) on to the surface to be marked. At least one additional component (C) can be introduced in front of the second mixing chamber.

Abstract (de)

Die beschriebene Vorrichtung dient zum Vermischen verschiedener Komponenten von Farben mit Zusätzen zu einer Mehrfarbenmischung zum Auftragen auf eine Fläche. Die Vorrichtung ist insbesondere für das Auftragen von Strassenmarkierungen vorgesehen, die spezielle Anforderungen inbezug auf Temperaturschwankungen, Trocknungszeit und Umweltschäden stellt. Im Vergleich zu bestehenden Vorrichtungen hat die vorliegende Ausführung den Vorteil, dass die einzelnen Komponenten in der Pistole und nicht ausserhalb derselben bzw. beim Auslass vermischt werden. Dies bedeutet, dass die Farbe gut gemischt ist bevor sie aufgetragen wird, wodurch vemieden wird, dass das Aufsprühen gewissermassen in Schichten erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/0458 (2013.01); B05B 7/0408 (2013.01); B05B 7/045 (2013.01); B05B 7/0483 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258293 A2 20021120; EP 1258293 A3 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-04-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI