Global Patent Index - EP 1258293 A3

EP 1258293 A3 2003-06-18 - Apparatus for spraying a multicomponent mix

Title (en)

Apparatus for spraying a multicomponent mix

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Spritzen einer Mehrkomponentenmischung

Title (fr)

Appareil de pulvérisation d'un mélange à plusieurs composants

Publication

EP 1258293 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02405359 A

Priority

CH 9072001 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1258293A2] The apparatus to spray a paint mixture, of a number of components, has a spray gun where the components are mixed. A mixing chamber (24), in a truncated cone shape, mixes one component (B) with compressed air. A second chamber (7), in a truncated cone shape, mixes the blend of compressed air and its component with another component (A). The whole mixture is sprayed through the slit (6) or a jet (10) on to the surface to be marked. At least one additional component (C) can be introduced in front of the second mixing chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/0458 (2013.01); B05B 7/0408 (2013.01); B05B 7/045 (2013.01); B05B 7/0483 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258293 A2 20021120; EP 1258293 A3 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-04-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI