Global Patent Index - EP 1258301 A2

EP 1258301 A2 2002-11-20 - Hemming machine with movable die cartridges

Title (en)

Hemming machine with movable die cartridges

Title (de)

Bördelvorrichtung mit bewegbaren Matrizenkassetten

Title (fr)

Machine de rabattage avec cassettes de matrices amouvibles

Publication

EP 1258301 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02253408 A

Priority

  • US 86106701 A
  • US 99981101 A

Abstract (en)

A hemming machine having a stationary base (22) and defining a work station (24). A lifting beam (26) is vertically movably mounted to the base at the work station while a motor assembly (32) moves the lifting beam between a raised and a lowered position. Two die cartridges (70, 72), each having hemming tooling (76, 78) and a nest (80, 82) vertically movably mounted to the die cartridge, are horizontally movable relative to the base by a conveyor assembly (54). A conveyor motor (90) selectively moves the die cartridges between a position laterally spaced from the work station and the work station. With the die cartridge positioned at the work station, a first clamp releasably (106) secures the nest to the lifting beam while a second clamp assembly (110) releasably secures the die cartridge to the base. With the nest secured to the lifting beam and the die cartridge secured to the base, hemming operations are performed at the work station in the conventional fashion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 39/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258301 A2 20021120; EP 1258301 A3 20031022; CA 2387033 A1 20021118; CA 2387033 C 20060808; MX PA02005028 A 20050908

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060425

2006-01-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DENIS, KEITH SAINT

2006-01-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: COTE, RAY

2006-01-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RAFFIN, LOUIS

2006-01-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARRISON, LEE

2004-07-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-07-14 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040305

- Countries: RO

2004-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI