Global Patent Index - EP 1258302 A2

EP 1258302 A2 2002-11-20 - Method and apparatus for producing precision castings

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for producing precision castings

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Präzisionsgussteilen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour couler des pièces de précision

Publication

EP 1258302 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02008460 A

Priority

DE 10120493 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10120493C1] Production of precision cast parts comprises filling casting molds (6) made from a ceramic material and a distributor channel (4) with a melt while rotating the casting wheel (1) about its axis (A-A); and removing the cast parts from the molds after solidifying the melt. The casting molds can be exchanged. An Independent claim is also included for a device for producing precision cast parts. Preferably the cast wheel has two wheel rings (2, 3) which collide with each other at an annular separating joint containing recesses for inserting the casting molds.

Abstract (de)

Zum Herstellen von Präzisionsgußteilen aus einer Schmelze wird ein metallisches Gießrad (1) verwendet, das einen ringförmigen Verteilerkanal (4) und mehrere auswechselbare Gießformen (6) mit mindestens je einer Eingußöffnung (6a) besitzt. Dabei wird die Schmelzenmenge pro Abguß so gewählt, daß die Gießformen (6) und der Verteilerkanal (4) beim Rotieren des Gießrades (1) um seine Achse (A-A) mit der Schmelze gefüllt werden, derart, daß die Präzisionsgußteile nach dem Erstarren der Schmelze durch einen im Verteilerkanal (4) gebildeten Ring aus dem Gußwerkstoff, dem sogenannten Umlaufmaterial für neue Gießprozesse, zusammengehalten und mit den Gießformen (6) aus dem Gießrad (1) entnommen werden, worauf die Präzisionsgußteile von dem Ring abgetrennt werden. Um hierdurch auch Präzisionsgußteile mit komplizierten Raumformen, insbesondere mit Hinterschneidungen, herstellen zu können, werden die einmal verwendbaren und zur Entformung zerstörbaren Gießformen (6) aus einem keramischen Werkstoff ausgewählt und formschlüssig und auswechselbar vom Gießrad (1) abstehend an dieses angesetzt. Dadurch kann das Umlaufmaterial unkontaminiert einem Recycling-Prozeß zugeführt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 13/06; B22D 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 21/00 (2006.01); B22C 9/02 (2006.01); B22C 9/04 (2006.01); B22D 13/00 (2006.01); B22D 13/06 (2006.01); B22D 13/10 (2006.01); B22D 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 13/107 (2013.01); B22C 9/02 (2013.01); B22D 13/066 (2013.01); B22D 13/101 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 10120493 C1 20020725; DE 50207760 D1 20060921; EP 1258302 A2 20021120; EP 1258302 A3 20041027; EP 1258302 B1 20060809; ES 2267886 T3 20070316; JP 2002361385 A 20021217; KR 20020083131 A 20021101; US 2002179275 A1 20021205; US 6725902 B2 20040427

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170502

2018-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171229

2017-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170413

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070510

2007-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2267886 T3

2007-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061030

2006-10-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207760 P 20060921

2006-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-08-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060809

2005-07-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-06-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050421

2004-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI