Global Patent Index - EP 1258316 A2

EP 1258316 A2 2002-11-20 - Apparatus for sharpening objects

Title (en)

Apparatus for sharpening objects

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Schärfen von Werkstücken

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affûtage de pièces

Publication

EP 1258316 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02001223 A

Priority

IT CA20010001 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus for sharpening objects (2) comprises abrading means (6) arranged for abrading an end portion of said objects (2) and for creating tip means (2a) in said objects (2) and support means (7) connected to rotation driving means (8) and arranged for supporting said abrading means (6), said abrading means (6) being fixed to said support means (7) by magnetic coupling means (15); the projection of the longitudinal axis of each object (2) on a plane containing an active surface (10) is tangent to a circumference the center of which lies on a rotation axis (X) of said abrading means (6); moving means (33) for moving said objects (2) are provided, the moving means (33) being arranged for driving said objects (2) to interact with regions of said active surface (10); in addition, transfer means (5) rotates each object (2) around the longitudinal axis thereof and moves each object (2) along said longitudinal axis towards said abrading means (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 19/16; B24B 41/06; B24D 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 19/16 (2006.01); B24B 41/06 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 19/16 (2013.01); B24B 41/061 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2002137445 A1 20020926; CA 2368633 A1 20020719; EP 1258316 A2 20021120; EP 1258316 A3 20040107; IT CA20010001 A1 20020719; IT CA20010001 D0 20010119

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040708

2004-11-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24B 19/16 A

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24B 41/06 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24D 9/08 B

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI