Global Patent Index - EP 1258319 A2

EP 1258319 A2 2002-11-20 - Vacuum clamping device for workpieces for a stationary tool machine

Title (en)

Vacuum clamping device for workpieces for a stationary tool machine

Title (de)

Vakuumspanneinrichtung für Werkstücke für stationär bearbeitende Maschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrage à vide de pièces pour une machine-outil stationnaire

Publication

EP 1258319 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02008474 A

Priority

DE 10124315 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10124315C1] The vacuum clamping system for workpieces (2), at static machine tools, has an injector jet (7) built into each suction clamp (1) as an individual underpressure generator. It is operated by compressed air, with a compressed air connection (8) for a compressed air line to a compressed air supply. A vacuum switch is at each vacuum clamp, connected to the suction chamber (3), to generate an electrical signal if the underpressure is over or below a given vacuum threshold level.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vakuumspanneinrichtung für Werkstücke für stationär bearbeitende hat Saugspanner (1), die auf einer Unterstützungskonstruktion angeordnet und zwecks Anpassung an unterschiedliche Werkstückformate positionierbar sind. Zum Spannen der auf sie auflegbaren Werkstücke (2) haben die Saugspanner (1) jeweils einen Saugraum (3) an ihrer Oberseite. Um die Aktivierung und Überwachung der einzelnen Saugspanner (1) einfacher durchführen zu können, hat jeder Saugspanner (1) eine eingebaute Injektordüse (7) als eigenen Unterdruckgenerator. Die Injektordüse (7) ist mit Druckluft betrieben, wozu außen am Saugspanner (1) ein Druckluftanschluß (8) vorgesehen ist, von dem eine Druckluftleitung (12) zu einer Druckluftversorgung (13) führt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 11/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 10124315 C1 20020711; DE 50206778 D1 20060622; EP 1258319 A2 20021120; EP 1258319 A3 20041013; EP 1258319 B1 20060517; ES 2260347 T3 20061101

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100416

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110704

2011-07-14 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110714

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090416

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070220

2006-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2260347 T3

2006-06-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206778 P 20060622

2006-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2006-05-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2005-07-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2005-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041118

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI