Global Patent Index - EP 1258320 A2

EP 1258320 A2 2002-11-20 - Drilling and milling machine for applying metal elements to furniture pieces

Title (en)

Drilling and milling machine for applying metal elements to furniture pieces

Title (de)

Bohr- und Fräsmaschine zum Anbringen von metallischen Elementen an Möbelstücken

Title (fr)

Perceuse-fraiseuse pour appliquer des éléments métalliques à des pièces de meuble

Publication

EP 1258320 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02008821 A

Priority

IT MI20011032 A

Abstract (en)

A drilling and milling machine for applying metal elements to furniture pieces comprises supporting means for supporting a workpiece by an operating head in a working station, driving means for driving the workpiece along the supporting means from at least a working station supplying position and from the working position to an unloading position, and clamping means for clamping the workpiece in said working station, characterized in that said driving means comprise suction cup means designed for affecting only a surface of the workpiece, while leaving the perimetrical and top edges of the workpiece free.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 11/00; B23Q 7/04; B27F 5/12; B27M 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 11/00 (2006.01); B27F 5/12 (2006.01); B27M 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27F 5/12 (2013.01); B25B 11/005 (2013.01); B27M 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258320 A2 20021120; EP 1258320 A3 20060719; EP 1258320 B1 20080820; DE 60228362 D1 20081002; IT MI20011032 A1 20021118; IT MI20011032 D0 20010517

INPADOC legal status


2012-03-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60228362

- Effective date: 20111101

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111101

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100927

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-07-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090525

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081201

2008-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60228362 P 20081002

2008-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES

2007-10-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-05-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2007-05-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES

2007-05-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE

2007-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070116

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-11-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALBERTI VITTORIO S.P.A.

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI