Global Patent Index - EP 1258329 A2

EP 1258329 A2 2002-11-20 - Machine for working plate-like workpieces with an adhesive device

Title (en)

Machine for working plate-like workpieces with an adhesive device

Title (de)

Maschine zum Bearbeiten plattenförmiger Werkstücke mit einem Verleimgerät

Title (fr)

Machine à usiner des pièces plates avec dispositif de collage

Publication

EP 1258329 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010004 A

Priority

DE 10124694 A

Abstract (en)

Machine for processing narrow-sided plate-like workpieces such as plates for furniture or interior decorating comprises a gluing machine (8) for gluing edge strips (9) on the narrow sides of a workpiece (5). A support device (14, 22) supporting the edge strip is provided in the region of the conveying path of the edge strip between the intermediate conveyor (13) and the gluing machine and/or between the magazine (11) of edge strip material and the intermediate conveyor. Preferred Features: The support device is arranged on the intermediate conveyor, gluing machine or magazine so that they move together.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer solchen Maschine ist das Verleimaggregat (8) zum Anleimen von Kantenstreifen (9) an Werkstückschmalflächenseiten an einem Support (1) entlang eines auf einem darunter befindlichen Bearbeitungsplatz angeordneten Werkstücks (5) in einer Horizontalebene verfahrbar. Ferner ist ein Magazin (11) für das Kantenstreifenmaterial vorhanden, dem eine Kappeinrichtung (12) nachgeordnet ist. Zwischen dem Magazin (11) und dem Verleimaggregat (8) ist ein Zwischenförderer (13) für das Übergeben des jeweiligen Kantenstreifens (9) an das Verleimaggregat (8) angeordnet, dazu sind das Verleimaggregat (8) und/oder der Zwischenförderer (13) verfahrbar. Um einen freien Durchhang des Kantenstreifens (9) über eine längere Strecke zu vermeiden, ist im Bereich der Förderstrecke des Kantenstreifens (9) zwischen dem Zwischenförderer (13) und dem Verleimaggregat (8) und/oder zwischen dem Magazin (11) und dem Zwischenförderer (13) eine den Kantenstreifen (9) unterfangende Stützvorrichtung (14, 22) vorhanden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27D 5/00; B27G 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27D 5/00 (2006.01); B27G 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27D 5/003 (2013.01); B27G 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258329 A2 20021120; EP 1258329 A3 20060524; EP 1258329 B1 20070815; DE 10124694 A1 20021128; DE 10124694 C2 20030403; DE 50210674 D1 20070927; ES 2291392 T3 20080301

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50210674

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120504

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100505

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110524

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110704

2011-07-14 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110714

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090408

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080516

2008-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2291392 T3

2007-09-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210674 P 20070927

2007-08-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2007-08-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMID, JOHANNES

2007-08-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOETZ, FRIEDER

2007-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2006-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060415

2006-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI