Global Patent Index - EP 1258350 A2

EP 1258350 A2 2002-11-20 - Method and apparatus for imaging in printing machines

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for imaging in printing machines

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Bebildern in Druckmaschinen

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour former des images dans des machines d'impression

Publication

EP 1258350 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02007602 A

Priority

DE 10123672 A

Abstract (en)

Process for imaging in printing machines with a plate cylinder or printing plate or sleeve on plate cylinder as image carrier comprises applying an ablatable coating to the carrier and ablation by a thermal imager to produce the motif dots by local limited burning under excess oxygen. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) Printing machine with the image carrier provided with a thermally ablatable coating and associated thermal imager, in which the coating contains oxygen donor in homogeneous, microscopically fine distribution; (2) Printing machine with the image carrier provided with an ablatable coating and associated thermal imager, in which the imager is an oxygen probe for dot-accurate supply of oxygen at the actual action points.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Bebildern in Druckmaschinen, bei dem der Plattenzylinder als Druckbildträger ausgebildet oder mit einem als Druckplatte oder Sleeve ausgebildeten Druckbildträger versehen ist, eine ablatierbare Beschichtung auf den Druckbildträger aufgebracht und diese zum Erzeugen von motivbildenden Stellen durch eine thermisch arbeitende Bebilderungseinrichtung ablatiert wird. Die Aufgabe der Erfindung besteht darin, ein Verfahren und eine Einrichtung zum Bebildem zu entwickeln, durch welche der Energieeintrag wesentlich verringert wird. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Aufgabe durch ein Verfahren gelöst, bei dem auf einen Druckbildträger (4, 11, 12) eine ablatierbare Beschichtung aufgebracht wird und diese zum Erzeugen von motivbildenden Stellen durch eine thermisch arbeitende Bebilderungseinrichtung (91, 92) ablatiert wird, wobei dieser Verbrennungsvorgang lokal begrenzt unter Überschuss von Sauerstoff erfolgt und die Beschichtung Sauerstoffdonatoren in homogener, mikroskopisch feiner Verteilung aufweist und der Bebilderungseinrichtung (92) eine Sauerstoffsonde (922) zum punktgenauen Zuführen von Sauerstoff an deren aktuellen Wirkungsstelle zugeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/1075 (2013.01); B41C 1/1033 (2013.01); B41P 2227/70 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9936266 A1 19990722 - SCITEX CORP LTD [IL], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258350 A2 20021120; EP 1258350 A3 20050323; EP 1258350 B1 20060322; DE 10123672 A1 20021205; DE 10123672 B4 20061221; DE 50206107 D1 20060511

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130404

2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50206107

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130404

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130404

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120419

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120507

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-09-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060707

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206107 P 20060511

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-03-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-04-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050210

2005-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-03-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI