Global Patent Index - EP 1258406 A2

EP 1258406 A2 2002-11-20 - Vehicle equipped with towing means and anti-skid control system

Title (en)

Vehicle equipped with towing means and anti-skid control system

Title (de)

Fahrzeug mit Zugmittel und Antiblockierbremssystem ausgerüstet

Title (fr)

Véhicule équipé de moyen de traction et d'un système d'antiblocage des freins

Publication

EP 1258406 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02011097 A

Priority

GB 0112099 A

Abstract (en)

A vehicle comprising a chassis, a front axle means and a rear axle means and there being a towing means secured to the rear axle means by which an implement may be towed characterised in that each wheel of the vehicle is provided with a wheel sensor, there is a controller responsive to wheel speed signals from said wheel speed sensors, for sensing skid conditions at said wheels and for generating skid control instructions, a wheel brake for each wheel, responsive to fluid pressure, hereinafter referred to as brake pressure, supplied thereto, from a fluid pressure supply in accordance with a brake demand signal and a skid control device controlled by said skid control instructions for modulating the brake demand signal to provide the brake pressure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60T 8/00; B60G 17/015

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60G 17/0195 (2006.01); B60G 21/10 (2006.01); B60T 8/17 (2006.01); B60T 8/32 (2006.01); B60T 8/46 (2006.01); B60T 13/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60T 13/581 (2013.01); B60G 17/0195 (2013.01); B60G 21/10 (2013.01); B60T 8/1708 (2013.01); B60T 8/329 (2013.01); B60T 8/46 (2013.01); B60G 2200/314 (2013.01); B60G 2200/315 (2013.01); B60G 2200/341 (2013.01); B60G 2202/12 (2013.01); B60G 2202/135 (2013.01); B60G 2202/154 (2013.01); B60G 2204/1224 (2013.01); B60G 2300/082 (2013.01); B60G 2300/09 (2013.01); B60G 2400/208 (2013.01); B60G 2400/252 (2013.01); B60G 2400/61 (2013.01); B60G 2400/822 (2013.01); B60G 2800/214 (2013.01); B60G 2800/215 (2013.01); B60G 2800/915 (2013.01); B60G 2800/922 (2013.01); B60T 2210/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9202381 A1 19920220 - JCB LANDPOWER LTD [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258406 A2 20021120; EP 1258406 A3 20030205; EP 1258406 B1 20061213; AT 348029 T 20070115; DE 60216661 D1 20070125; DE 60216661 T2 20070927; DK 1258406 T3 20070423; ES 2275772 T3 20070616; GB 0112099 D0 20010711; GB 2376992 A 20021231; GB 2376992 B 20050323; US 2002185914 A1 20021212

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180522

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180522

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180518

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180528

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180625

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180522

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180518

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070517

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070314

2008-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070914

2007-06-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2275772 T3

2007-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-05-14 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070514

2007-03-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070313

2007-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60216661 P 20070125

2007-01-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-12-13 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2006-12-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2006-12-13 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2006-12-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2006-12-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040706

2003-10-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JCB LANDPOWER LTD

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI