Global Patent Index - EP 1258412 A2

EP 1258412 A2 2002-11-20 - Railway signalling system

Title (en)

Railway signalling system

Title (de)

Eisenbahn-Signalsystem

Title (fr)

Système de signalisation de chemin de fer

Publication

EP 1258412 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02077057 A

Priority

  • NL 1018111 A
  • NL 1020623 A

Abstract (en)

Railway signalling system with sensors detecting the presence or passage of a train, such as shaft counters, of a remote computer within a relais house which is connected to the computer of the railway traffic control centre; wherein the computer in the relais house is provided with a malfunction forecast system; and/or wherein there are wire less communication means to be able to receive at a distance from the relais house data from the computer in the relais house.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61L 1/20; B61L 1/16; H04L 12/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 1/16 (2006.01); B61L 1/20 (2006.01); B61L 23/00 (2006.01); G08C 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 1/168 (2013.01); B61L 1/169 (2013.01); B61L 1/20 (2013.01); B61L 27/0088 (2013.01); B61L 2205/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258412 A2 20021120; EP 1258412 A3 20030226; NL 1020623 A1 20021119; NL 1020623 C2 20030418

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-18 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20081016

2007-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060428

2003-11-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI