Global Patent Index - EP 1258428 A1

EP 1258428 A1 2002-11-20 - Machine for fixing lids to packages for moist wipes, tissues or the like

Title (en)

Machine for fixing lids to packages for moist wipes, tissues or the like

Title (de)

Maschine zum Befestigen von Deckeln auf Verpackungen von feuchten Tüchern

Title (fr)

Machine pour fixer des couvercles sur des emballages de lingettes ou mouchoirs humides

Publication

EP 1258428 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01111248 A

Priority

EP 01111248 A

Abstract (en)

A machine (10) for fixing lids (11) to packages (12) for moist wipes, tissues or the like, comprising, on a supporting structure (14), elements (15) for the advancement of enclosures (13) for packages (12), a lid application unit (16), adhesive distribution elements (17) and elements (18) for feeding the lids (11), the application unit being arranged below the advancement elements so as to apply the lids from below. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 61/18; B31B 19/84; B65C 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 19/84 (2006.01); B65B 61/18 (2006.01); B65C 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 1/021 (2013.01); B65B 61/184 (2013.01); B31B 70/844 (2017.08)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258428 A1 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090415

2008-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081002

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030513

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI