Global Patent Index - EP 1258431 A1

EP 1258431 A1 2002-11-20 - Tube for viscous products

Title (en)

Tube for viscous products

Title (de)

Tube für pastöse Produckte

Title (fr)

Tube pour produits visqueux

Publication

EP 1258431 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01830315 A

Priority

EP 01830315 A

Abstract (en)

A container for viscous products comprises a body (2) for containing the product, having a substantially tubular shape and made of soft material able to be squeezed manually by the user; a head (3) coupled to the open end of the tubular body (2), the head (3) comprising a shoulder (30) from which a dispensing mouth (32) protrudes axially for dispensing of the product; and a lid (4) which can be associated with said head (3) in order to be able to obstruct/free the dispensing mouth (32) to prevent/allow discharge of the product. The head (3) is removably coupled to the tubular body (2), so that the user can remove it from the tubular body (2) to allow removal of the residual product remaining inside the container. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 35/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 35/12 (2006.01); B65D 35/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 35/44 (2013.01); B65D 35/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258431 A1 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040607

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030509

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI