Global Patent Index - EP 1258441 A2

EP 1258441 A2 2002-11-20 - Adhesive tape

Title (en)

Adhesive tape

Title (de)

Klebeband

Title (fr)

Bande adhésive

Publication

EP 1258441 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009196 A

Priority

DE 10123981 A

Abstract (en)

Adhesive tape (1) for continuous reel changes comprises a support (2) having a self-adhesive composition (3) arranged on the upper side, and a splicing system (6A) arranged on the under side with a paper support (7) glued on one side by a self-adhesive composition (8) to the under side of the support and having on the other side a self-adhesive composition (9). A further splicing system (6B) is arranged a distance (W) of 3-50 mm from the first splicing system with a paper support glued on one side by a self-adhesive composition (8) to the under side of the support and having on the other side a self-adhesive composition (9). An Independent claim is also included for a splicing process for the above scotch tape. Preferred Features: The distance (W) is 25-40, preferably 35-40 mm. The splicing systems consist of the same material and therefore have the same splicing force, or they consist of different materials and have different splicing forces. The support is a tear-resistant paper or foil support. The self-adhesive compositions (3, 8, 9) are based on acrylates (water-insoluble or especially water-soluble), natural rubber and/or synthetic rubber and dispersions of the above.

Abstract (de)

Klebeband (1) für den fliegenden Rollenwechsel, mit a) einem Träger (2), auf dessen Oberseite eine Selbstklebemasse (3) angeordnet ist, und b) auf dessen Unterseite ein spaltfähiges System (6A) angeordnet ist, mit einem Papierträger (7), der auf der einen Seite mittels einer Selbstklebemasse (8) auf die Unterseite des Trägers (2) geklebt ist, und der auf der anderen Seite eine Selbstklebemasse (9) aufweist, dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass, c) in einem Abstand (W) von 3 - 50 mm zu dem spaltfähigen System (6A) ein weiteres spaltfähiges System (6B) angeordnet ist, wiederum mit einem Papierträger (7), der auf der einen Seite mittels einer Selbstklebemasse (8) auf die Unterseite des Trägers (2) geklebt ist, und der auf der anderen Seite eine Selbstklebemasse (9) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09J 7/02 (2006.01); B65H 19/10 (2006.01); C09J 201/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/102 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4607 (2013.01); B65H 2301/46078 (2013.01); Y10T 428/14 (2013.01); Y10T 428/15 (2013.01); Y10T 428/28 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2848 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258441 A2 20021120; EP 1258441 A3 20040204; EP 1258441 B1 20060503; AT 325067 T 20060615; CA 2383553 A1 20021117; CA 2383553 C 20090908; DE 10123981 A1 20030123; DE 50206622 D1 20060608; ES 2262725 T3 20061201; JP 2002338922 A 20021127; JP 5196619 B2 20130515; US 2002172790 A1 20021121; US 7108220 B2 20060919

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170517

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170412

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-03-03 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20170201

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TESA SE, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TESA SE, 20253 HAMBURG, DE

- Document: DE 50206622

2011-04-15 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: TESA SE

- Effective date: 20110415

2010-04-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2010-04-09 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070425

2009-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070425

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060804

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: TESA A.G.

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070206

2006-12-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-12-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2262725 T3

2006-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-10-03 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-08-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-08-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060803

2006-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060614

2006-06-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206622 P 20060608

2006-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-05-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-05-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040909

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-09-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TESA AG

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI