Global Patent Index - EP 1258444 A1

EP 1258444 A1 2002-11-20 - Unlocking device for landing doors of elevators

Title (en)

Unlocking device for landing doors of elevators

Title (de)

Entriegelungsvorrichtung an Schachttüren von Aufzügen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de déverrouillage pour portes palières d' ascenseurs

Publication

EP 1258444 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02009915 A

Priority

  • EP 02009915 A
  • EP 01810471 A

Abstract (en)

Unlocking device for lift shaft doors comprises a locking lever (3) unlocked by an unlocking element (10) interacting with a spindle (23) rotatably supported on a bearing (22). Preferred Features: A spindle nut (24) attached to the unlocking element forms part of the connection. The locking lever, unlocking element and the spindle are mounted on a support plate (1). The unlocking element is designed as an unlocking bar guided on the support plate. The spindle has a triangular operating element (21) on one of its ends.

Abstract (de)

Bei dieser Entriegelungsvorrichtung steht ein Verriegelungshebel (3) über einen Entriegelungsschieber (10) mit einer Betätigungseinrichtung (20) in Wirkverbindung. Der Entriegelungsschieber (10) besteht lediglich aus einem Teil, das unmittelbar an einem Trägerblech (1) gehalten und geführt wird. Die Betätigungseinrichtung (20) weist ein Betätigungsglied (21) auf, das mit einer Spindel (23), die mit einem nicht-selbsthemmenden Steilgewinde versehen ist, drehfest verbunden ist. Auf der Spindel (23) ist eine Spindelmutter (24) geführt, an welcher der Entriegelungsschieber (10) befestigt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258444 A1 20021120; EP 1258444 B1 20051005

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120503

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50204433

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120503

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120503

2013-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 305897 T

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110812

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110512

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110607

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060706

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051111

2005-11-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50204433 P 20051110

2005-10-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-10-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2005-10-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040402

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030428

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI