Global Patent Index - EP 1258445 A1

EP 1258445 A1 2002-11-20 - Elevator landing door

Title (en)

Elevator landing door

Title (de)

Aufzug-Schachttüre

Title (fr)

Porte palière d' ascenseur

Publication

EP 1258445 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02009916 A

Priority

  • EP 02009916 A
  • EP 01810472 A

Abstract (en)

Lift shaft door has at least two door leafs (2, 3). Holding plates (4, 5) with square shoulders (4.1, 5.1) provided on the rear side of the door leafs contain exchangeable profiles (6, 7) determining the further course in the rear region of the lift shaft door of a gap (8) produced in the front region of the lift shaft door between the door leafs. Preferred Features: The profiles have walls (6.1, 7.1) angled toward the rear side of the lift shaft door and crossing an axis of symmetry (9) of the lift shaft door. The walls determine the further course of the gap and form a fire obstacle.

Abstract (de)

Bei dieser Aufzug-Schachttüre sind an den Rückseiten der Türflügel (2,3) Haltebleche (4,5) mit rechtwinkligen Absätzen (4.1,5.1) vorgesehen, in welche auswechselbare Profile (6,7) eingesetzt sind. Durch die Profile (6,7) wird der weitere Verlauf eines im vorderen Bereich der Aufzug-Schachttüre gegebenen Türspaltes (8) in deren hinteren Bereich bestimmt. In einer besonderen Ausführungsform weisen die Profile (6,7) schräg zur Rückseite der Aufzug-Schachttüre verlaufende, eine Symmetrieachse (9) der Aufzug-Schachttüre kreuzende Wände (6.1,7.1) auf, durch die eine Brandschikane (10) gebildet wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 13/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/30 (2006.01); E06B 3/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/303 (2013.01); E06B 3/4636 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 04 30 April 1999 (1999-04-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258445 A1 20021120; EP 1258445 B1 20051109

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171201

2017-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50204821

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140503

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140503

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140503

2015-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 309171 T

- Effective date: 20140503

2014-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130603

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130527

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060124

2005-12-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50204821 P 20051215

2005-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2005-11-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040402

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030428

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI