Global Patent Index - EP 1258447 A1

EP 1258447 A1 2002-11-20 - Person transporting device with self driven treadles

Title (en)

Person transporting device with self driven treadles

Title (de)

Personenfördervorrichtung mit direktangetriebenen Trittkörpern

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour transport de personne avec marchepied autopropulsé

Publication

EP 1258447 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02010001 A

Priority

  • EP 02010001 A
  • EP 01810483 A

Abstract (en)

The system operates without a chain. Each panel (11) runs on rollers and is driven by an electric motor. A system supplies current to each panel. Each panel has a sensor determining its spacing from the next, which reports to control electronics provided for the motors. At the ends of the travelator, a tilt station inclines the panels.

Abstract (de)

Die erfindungsgemäße kettenlose Personenfördervorrichtung hat direkt angetriebene Trittkörper (11), die in einer Richtung hintereinander hinlaufen und darunter schneller zurücklaufen. Jeder Trittkörper (11) läuft auf Rollen (12, 12', 13, 13'), von denen zwei (12, 12') durch je einen Elektromotor (14 bzw. 14') angetrieben sind. Jeder Trittkörper (11) verfügt über eine Einrichtung zur Stromversorgung. Weiters weist jeder Trittkörper (11) vier Sensoren (15, 15', 16, 16') zur Bestimmung des Abstandes zum nächsten Trittkörper () auf. Eine Steuerelektronik (18) steuert die Elektromotoren (14, 14') in Abhängigkeit vom Signal der Sensoren (15, 15', 16, 16'), sodass die Trittkörper (11) im Bereich (1) für den Personentransport unmittelbar hintereinander laufen. An den Enden der Personenfördervorrichtung ist jeweils eine Kippstation (3, 4) zur Neigung der Trittkörper (11) vorgesehen. Bei bevorzugten Ausführungsformen sind die Trittkörper mittels eines Reibradantriebs oder aber mittels zusätzlichen Zackenrädern direkt angetrieben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 23/10; B66B 21/10; B66B 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 21/02 (2006.01); B66B 23/02 (2006.01); B66B 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 21/02 (2013.01); B66B 23/02 (2013.01); B66B 25/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258447 A1 20021120; EP 1258447 B1 20091223

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171201

2018-03-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180131

2017-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50214113

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100504

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100504

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100504

2010-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100924

2010-02-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50214113 P 20100204

2009-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2009-12-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030428

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI