Global Patent Index - EP 1258451 A2

EP 1258451 A2 2002-11-20 - Industrial truck with a side-shifting mechanism

Title (en)

Industrial truck with a side-shifting mechanism

Title (de)

Flurförderzeug mit einer Schubvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Chariot de manutention avec un dispositif de déplacement latéral

Publication

EP 1258451 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009969 A

Priority

DE 10123780 A

Abstract (en)

Industrial truck comprises a pushing device pushing a carriage in a horizontal direction relative to a support (4) fixed on a lifting frame. A toothed wheel arranged on the carriage engages in at least one toothed rack (12) fixed on the support. At least one guard (13) is arranged above and/or below the toothed rack. Preferred Features: The guard extends in the direction of the carriage at least over the same distance as the toothed rack. The guard is formed by an elongated body parallel to the toothed rack and is made of sheet metal.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Flurförderzeug mit einer Schubvorrichtung, bei der ein Schubschlitten (5) relativ zu einem an einem Hubgerüst (2) befestigten Träger (4) in im Wesentlichen horizontaler Richtung verschiebbar ist. An dem Träger (4) ist mindestens eine Zahnstange (12) befestigt, in die ein an dem Schubschlitten (5) angeordnetes Zahnrad eingreift. Erfindungsgemäß ist oberhalb und/oder unterhalb der Zahnstange (12) mindestens ein Abweiser (13) angeordnet. Der Abweiser (13) erstreckt sich mindestens ebenso weit in Richtung des Schubschlittens (5), wie die Zahnstange (12). Bevorzugt ist der Abweiser (13) aus Blech ausgebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/147 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258451 A2 20021120; EP 1258451 A3 20050202; EP 1258451 B1 20110302; DE 10123780 A1 20021121; DE 50214928 D1 20110414

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50214928

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150504

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150503

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140520

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140520

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110602

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-03-29 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50214928

- Effective date: 20111205

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110602

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-02-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111205

2011-06-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2011-04-14 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50214928

- Effective date: 20110414

2011-04-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50214928 P 20110414

2011-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2011-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2011-01-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KION WAREHOUSE SYSTEMS GMBH

2008-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STILL WAGNER GMBH

2005-10-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2005-08-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI