Global Patent Index - EP 1258535 A1

EP 1258535 A1 2002-11-20 - PROCESS FOR ELECTROLYTIC PRODUCTION OF HIGHLY PURE ZINC OR ZINC COMPOUNDS FROM PRIMARY AND SECONDARY ZINC RAW MATERIALS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR ELECTROLYTIC PRODUCTION OF HIGHLY PURE ZINC OR ZINC COMPOUNDS FROM PRIMARY AND SECONDARY ZINC RAW MATERIALS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTROLYTISCHEN HERSTELLUNG VON HOCHREINEM ZINK ODER ZINKVERBINDUNGEN AUS PRIMÄREM ODER SEKUNDÄREM ZINKROHMATERIAL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ELECTROLYTIQUE DE ZINC ET DE COMPOSES DE ZINC TRES PURS A PARTIR DE MATIERES PREMIERES ET DERIVEES DE ZINC

Publication

EP 1258535 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00979685 A

Priority

  • ES 0000458 W
  • ES 9902777 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a process involving the following steps: a) performing leaching of the raw material with an acid aqueous solution to dissolve the zinc if said raw material is a solid; b) optionally performing solid-liquid separation; c) neutralizing the aqueous solution once the zinc-containing raw material is in liquid form; d) performing solid-liquid separation of the solution rich in zinc from the solids precipitated during the neutralization step; e) extracting the zinc using an acid organic solvent; f) purifying the organic solvent from the extraction step; g) re-extracting zinc from the organic solvent using an acid aqueous solution; h) recovering the zinc by electrolysis and/or crystallization and/or precipitation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22B 3/26; C22B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22B 3/26 (2006.01); C22B 19/00 (2006.01); C25C 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22B 19/22 (2013.01); C22B 3/0005 (2013.01); C22B 19/26 (2013.01); Y02P 10/234 (2015.11)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0144520A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258535 A1 20021120; EP 1258535 B1 20030806; AT 246735 T 20030815; AU 1708701 A 20010625; AU 780362 B2 20050317; CA 2394658 A1 20010621; CA 2394658 C 20101026; CN 1271224 C 20060823; CN 1415022 A 20030430; DE 60004406 D1 20030911; DE 60004406 T2 20040609; EA 004600 B1 20040624; EA 200200567 A1 20021226; ES 2159263 A1 20010916; ES 2159263 B1 20020416; MX PA02005934 A 20021023; US 6869520 B1 20050322; WO 0144520 A1 20010621

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121217

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-28 [PRVN] PETITION FOR REVIEW BY THE ENLARGED BOARD OF APPEAL NOT GRANTED

- Free text: PETITION FOR REVIEW OBVIOUSLY INADMISSABLE (NOT DEEMED TO BE FILED) OR SIMULTANEOUSLY OBVIOUSLY INADMISSABLE AND OBVIOUSLY UNSUBSTANTIATED

- Effective date: 20100322

2009-09-02 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090112

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-29 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20081015

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-06-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: OUTOKUMPU OY

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030806

2004-01-06 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040106

2003-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-12-01 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-12-01 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-11-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-11-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031117

2003-11-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-11-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60004406 P 20030911

2003-09-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-08-06 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-08-06 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-08-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-08-06 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030806

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020530

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI