Global Patent Index - EP 1258539 A2

EP 1258539 A2 2002-11-20 - Process and apparatus for coating a metallic strip espescially a cold rolled steel strip

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for coating a metallic strip espescially a cold rolled steel strip

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Beschichten von Metallband, insbesondere von kaltgewalztem Stahlband

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de revêtement d'une bande métallique en particulier d'une bande d'acier laminée à froid

Publication

EP 1258539 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009001 A

Priority

DE 10123784 A

Abstract (en)

Process for coating a metal strip (3), especially a cold rolled steel strip, comprises heating the strip in an oven; annealing, adjusting the strip temperature and the surface properties in a cooling zone (1a); guiding through a coating vessel; and controlling the coating metal thickness and solidification process using a gas-driven rolling device. In a partial region of the cooling zone of the oven, the operating gas is pre-heated for the rolling device (7). An Independent claim is also included for a device for coating a metal strip, especially a cold rolled steel strip, comprising a heat exchanger (11) arranged within the cooling zone of the oven for the metal strip. The gas for the rolling device is pre-heated in the heat exchanger. Preferred Features: Pre-heating is carried out at 20-250 degrees C. Air, nitrogen or a non-oxidizing gas is used for pre-heating the operating gas.

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren und eine Einrichtung zum Beschichten von Metallband (3), insbesondere von kaltgewalztem Stahlband, mit einem im Schmelzenzustand befindlichen Beschichtungsmetall (5), wobei das Metallband (3) in einem Erwärmungsofen (1) erwärmt und geglüht wird und nachfolgend in einer Kühlzone (1a) die erforderliche Bandtemperatur und Oberflächeneigenschaften eingestellt werden und in weiteren Schritten durch den Beschichtungsbehälter (4) geführt und in Bandauszugsrichtung (10) hinter dem Beschichtungsbehälter (4) die Beschichtungsmetall-Dicke (8) und der Erstarrungsvorgang mit einer gasbetriebenen Abstreifvorrichtung (7) gesteuert werden, kann das Abstreifverhalten des flüssigen Beschichtungsmetalls (5) auf der Bandoberfläche verbessern und an Beschichtungsmetall (5) dadurch sparen, indem in einem Teilbereich der Kühlzone (1a) des Erwärmungsofens (1) das Betriebsgas für die Abstreifvorrichtung (7) vorgewärmt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 2/02; C23C 2/00; C23C 2/18; C23C 2/20; C23C 2/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 2/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258539 A2 20021120; EP 1258539 A3 20040107; DE 10123784 A1 20021121; US 2002170493 A1 20021121; US 6800327 B2 20041005

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-26 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120821

2009-06-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS SIEMAG AG

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040824

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 2/02 A

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 2/20 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 2/24 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 2/18 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 2/00 B

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020423

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI