Global Patent Index - EP 1258540 A1

EP 1258540 A1 2002-11-20 - Mask member for placing on an engine body during the thermal coating of the internal cylinder bores and process using this masking member

Title (en)

Mask member for placing on an engine body during the thermal coating of the internal cylinder bores and process using this masking member

Title (de)

Maske zum Aufsetzen auf einen Motorblock beim thermischen Beschichten von darin eingelassenen Zylinderbohrungen sowie Verfahren unter Verwendung der Maske

Title (fr)

Masque pour placer sur un bloc moteur lors de l'application thermique de revêtement des alésages des cylindres et procédé utilisant ce masque

Publication

EP 1258540 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02405024 A

Priority

CH 8982001 A

Abstract (en)

Mask (4) for placing on an engine block (1) during thermal coating of cylinder bores (2) has a hollow cylindrical shape and agrees with the diameter of the bores to be coated. Preferred Features: The mask has a tubular outer part (5) and an insert (6). The mask and the insert lie on a circular surface along the cylinder bores to be coated. The insert protrudes over the outer part on the lower side. The insert is made of a metallic, ceramic and/or organic material.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Maske (4) zum Aufsetzen auf einen Motorblock (1) beim thermischen Beschichten von darin eingelassenen Zylinderbohrungen (2) vorgeschlagen. Die Maske (4) ist im wesentlichen hohlzylindrisch ausgebildet und auf den Durchmesser der zu beschichtenden Zylinderbohrung (2) abgestimmt ist. Die Maske (4) ist entweder mit einem entfernbaren Einsatz (6) versehen oder derart ausgebildet, dass zumindest ein Teil der beim Beschichten der Zylinderlauffläche auf der Innenseite der Maske aufgetragenen Schicht(en) mechanisch entfernbar ist/sind. Durch die vorgeschlagene Maske (4) kann die Beschichtungsvorrichtung ausserhalb der Zylinderbohrung (2) aktiviert werden, ohne dass Teile des Motorblocks oder der Umgebung durch Beschichtungspartikel verschmutzt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 4/00; C23C 4/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/00 (2006.01); B05B 15/04 (2006.01); C23C 4/01 (2016.01); C23C 4/16 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/16 (2013.01); B05B 12/20 (2018.02); C23C 4/01 (2016.01); B05B 7/222 (2013.01); B05B 13/0636 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20200739 U1 20020328; AT 548478 T 20120315; CA 2373001 A1 20021115; CA 2373001 C 20100511; EP 1258540 A1 20021120; EP 1258540 B1 20120307; JP 2002339053 A 20021127; JP 4230703 B2 20090225; KR 100867241 B1 20081110; KR 20020087342 A 20021122; US 2002172769 A1 20021121

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160116

2016-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160117

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160116

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-10-05 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160116

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50215407

2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130116

2015-06-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120307

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150204

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150129

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150203

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150129

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150129

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-08-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130116

2014-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 548478 T

- Effective date: 20130116

2014-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130116

2013-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-23 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-08-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SULZER METCO A.G.

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120618

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130111

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-04-04 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50215407

- Effective date: 20121210

2013-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121210

2013-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120307

2012-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120709

2012-09-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120307

2012-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120608

2012-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120307

2012-05-30 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2012-05-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2012-05-03 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50215407

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-04-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2012-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-03-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 548478 T

- Effective date: 20120315

2012-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2012-03-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040906

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI